This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/18/2023 at 07:16:56 (UTC).

HOLLAND v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT et al

Case Summary

On 05/19/2023 HOLLAND filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against U S DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are James B. Clark and Michael E. Farbiarz. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-02724

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

James B. Clark

Presiding Judge

Michael E. Farbiarz

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARIE HOLLAND

Defendants

U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

CAPITAL REALTY GROUP, INC. doing business as PROSPECT PARK APARTMENTS CRG LLC

MOSHE EISCHLER

SAM HOROWITZ

GLENDA ARNAU

MARIO ARNAU

ANZHELA KATSYUBA

CITY OF EAST ORANGE

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Application IFP, #2 Proposed IFP Order, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C)(adc, ) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

1 #1

Application IFP

1 #2

Proposed IFP Order

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit A

1 #5

Exhibit B

1 #6

Exhibit C

#2

(#2) Notice of Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se (adc, ) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

#3

(#3) Letter to the Honorable Judge Padin from Plaintiff, MARIE HOLLAND. (jd, ) (Entered: 06/16/2023)

#4

(#4) Order Granting #1 -1 IFP Application to proceed without payment of fees. Signed by Judge Evelyn Padin on 6/20/2023. (jd, ) (Entered: 06/20/2023)

#7

(#7) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to MARIE HOLLAND. (jd, ) (Entered: 07/11/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to MARIE HOLLAND. (jd, ) (Entered: 07/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT see #1 against Defendants GLENDA ARNAU, MARIO ARNAU, CAPITAL REALTY GROUP, INC., CITY OF EAST ORANGE, MOSHE EISCHLER, SAM HOROWITZ, ANZHELA KATSYUBA, and U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT with JURY DEMAND, filed by MARIE HOLLAND.(jd, ) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) TEXT ORDER: On 6/20/2023, the Court granted Plaintiff's IFP application to proceed without payment of fees D.E. #4 . Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall file the Complaint; and it is further ORDERED that, at this time, summons shall not issue, as the Court's sua sponte screening has not yet been completed; and it is finally ORDERED that the time to serve process pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) is hereby extended to the date ninety (90) days after the Court has completed its sua sponte screening of the Complaint. So Ordered by Judge Evelyn Padin on 7/6/2023. (bt, ) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2023
  • Docket(#5) TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Michael E. Farbiarz for all further proceedings. Judge Evelyn Padin no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 6/21/23. (ak, ) (Entered: 06/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Granting #1 -1 IFP Application to proceed without payment of fees. Signed by Judge Evelyn Padin on 6/20/2023. (jd, ) (Entered: 06/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Letter to the Honorable Judge Padin from Plaintiff, MARIE HOLLAND. (jd, ) (Entered: 06/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se (adc, ) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Application IFP, #2 Proposed IFP Order, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C)(adc, ) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less