This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/10/2023 at 07:20:29 (UTC).

Rodriguez v. BATH & BODY WORKS, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/11/2023 Rodriguez filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BATH BODY WORKS, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Raag Singhal. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:23-CV-61750

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Raag Singhal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fredesvinda Rodriguez

Defendants

BATH & BODY WORKS, LLC

WRI JT Pembroke Commons, LP

Kimco Realty Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lance Charles Rudzinski

Defendant Attorneys

Carlos Alberto Ziegenhirt

Jaime Angel Pozo

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Fredesvinda Rodriguez v. Bath & Body Works, LLC; WRI JT Pembroke Commons, LP and Kimco Realty Corporation) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16908048, filed by BATH & BODY WORKS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Pozo, Jaime) (Complaint see Exh.D pg. 19, no Answer/Motion to Dismiss filed) Modified text on 9/12/2023 (pc). (Entered: 09/11/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit B

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit C

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibit D

1 #6

Exhibit Exhibit E

#3

(#3) Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by BATH & BODY WORKS, LLC. (Pozo, Jaime) (Entered: 09/12/2023)

#4

(#4) Initial Disclosure(s) of Disclosure Statement by BATH & BODY WORKS, LLC (Pozo, Jaime) (Entered: 09/12/2023)

#7

(#7) Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by BATH & BODY WORKS, LLC identifying Corporate Parent RETAIL STORE OPERATIONS, INC., Other Affiliate Bath & Body Works, Inc. for BATH & BODY WORKS, LLC (Pozo, Jaime) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

#8

(#8) Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Joint Scheduling Report due by 10/5/2023 Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 9/14/2023. See attached document for full details. (drz) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, Stipulation to Cap Plaintiff's Damages and Remand to State Court by BATH & BODY WORKS, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order on Stipulation to Cap Plaintiff's Damages and Remand to State Court)(Pozo, Jaime) (Entered: 10/05/2023)

9 #1

Text of Proposed Order Order on Stipulation to Cap Plaintiff's Damages and

#10

(#10) ORDER REMANDING ACTION TO STATE COURT Closing Case. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 10/10/2023. See attached document for full details. (pcs) (Entered: 10/10/2023)

#11

(#11) Transmittal Letter Sent with Certified Copy of Order to: 17th Judicial Circuit, Broward County, Florida. State Court Case Number: CACE-23-007889 (Attachments: #1 Certified Copy of Order) (pcs) (Entered: 10/10/2023)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) Transmittal Letter Sent with Certified Copy of Order to: 17th Judicial Circuit, Broward County, Florida. State Court Case Number: CACE-23-007889 (Attachments: #1 Certified Copy of Order) (pcs) (Entered: 10/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) ORDER REMANDING ACTION TO STATE COURT Closing Case. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 10/10/2023. See attached document for full details. (pcs) (Entered: 10/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) STIPULATION re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, Stipulation to Cap Plaintiff's Damages and Remand to State Court by BATH & BODY WORKS, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order on Stipulation to Cap Plaintiff's Damages and Remand to State Court)(Pozo, Jaime) (Entered: 10/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Joint Scheduling Report due by 10/5/2023 Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 9/14/2023. See attached document for full details. (drz) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by BATH & BODY WORKS, LLC identifying Corporate Parent RETAIL STORE OPERATIONS, INC., Other Affiliate Bath & Body Works, Inc. for BATH & BODY WORKS, LLC (Pozo, Jaime) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

Docket(#6) PAPERLESS ORDER TO FILE CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONSWithin SEVEN (7) DAYS of entry of an appearance, each party, including governmental parties, must file certificates of interested parties and corporate disclosure statements that contain a complete list of persons, associated persons, firms, partnerships, or corporations that have a financial interest in the outcome of this case, including subsidiaries, conglomerates, affiliates, parent corporations, and other identifiable legal entities related to a party. The parties shall not include Judge Singhal or the paired magistrate judges unless they have an interest in the litigation. Throughout the pendency of the action, the parties are under a continuing obligation to amend, correct, and update the certificates. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 9/13/2023. (am00) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

Docket(#5) NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICEUnless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall: be double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c). The Court cautions parties against excessive use of footnotes.Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions (and responses to motions) with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions (and responses).Parties are encouraged to seek extensions of time in a timely fashion. "A motion for extension of time is not self-executing; no motion is, unless expressly provided for by the applicable rule. Yet, by filing these motions on or near the last day, and then sitting idle pending the Court's disposition of the motion, parties essentially grant their own motion. The Court will not condone this." Compere v. Nusret Miami, LLC, 2020 WL 2844888, at *2 (S.D. Fla. May 7, 2020) (internal citations omitted).Exhibits to pleadings and motions shall be docketed in accordance with the Courts CM/ECF procedures, Rule 3L.(2): (2) Describing an Attachment to a Docket EntryA party filing an attachment to a document shall select one of the prescribed attachment categories from the drop-down menu (e.g., affidavit, transcript), provide an alphabetical or numerical designation (e.g., Exhibit A, Exhibit 1), and descriptively name each attachment (e.g., Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Boo Radley) in a manner that enables the Court to easily locate and distinguish attachments. (Emphasis added.) Local Rule 16.4, Local Rules for the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, requires that a Notice of Settlement "shall be filed and served jointly by counsel for all parties to the settlement." A unilateral notice of settlement will not stay pre-trial deadlines or hearings.Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 9/13/2023. (am00) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Initial Disclosure(s) of Disclosure Statement by BATH & BODY WORKS, LLC (Pozo, Jaime) (Entered: 09/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by BATH & BODY WORKS, LLC. (Pozo, Jaime) (Entered: 09/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023

Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pc) (Entered: 09/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Fredesvinda Rodriguez v. Bath & Body Works, LLC; WRI JT Pembroke Commons, LP and Kimco Realty Corporation) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16908048, filed by BATH & BODY WORKS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Pozo, Jaime) (Complaint see Exh.D pg. 19, no Answer/Motion to Dismiss filed) Modified text on 9/12/2023 (pc). (Entered: 09/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less