This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/08/2023 at 08:29:27 (UTC).

Fleet Connect Solutions LLC v. Penske Automotive Group, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On May 9, 2023, Fleet Connect Solutions LLC (“Plaintiff”), represented by Carey Matthew Rozier, James Francis McDonough III, Jonathan L. Hardt, Travis E. Lynch, and Jonathan R. Miller of Rozier Hardt Mcdonough PLLC, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Penske Automotive Group, Inc., Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P., and Penske Logistics LLC (collectively, “Defendants”), seeking permanent injunctive relief with damages for alleged infringement of U.S. patents owned by the plaintiff. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Texas.  

In the complaint, the plaintiff alleged, “Based upon public information, Defendants own, operate, advertise, and/or control products and services that provide and/or utilize infringing systems and/or methods manufactured by Zonar Systems, Inc. (‘Zonar’).”  

The plaintiff then alleged, “Defendants use, cause to be used, sell, offer for sale, provide, supply, or distribute one or more fleet management and tracking solutions utilizing infringing systems and/or methods manufactured by Zonar, including, but not limited to, the Zonar telematics control unit and the Zonar Ground Traffic Control platform (the ‘Accused Products’).”

Plaintiff further alleged, “Defendants use the Accused Products to perform wireless communications and methods associated with performing and/or implementing wireless communications including, but not limited to, wireless communications and methods pursuant to various communication standards, protocols, and implementations, including, but not limited to LTE, Bluetooth/IEEE 802.15, and IEEE 802.11 protocols and various subsections thereof (e.g., 802.11ac and 802.11n).”

Plaintiff also alleged, “Defendants also advertise that ‘Penske vehicles equipped with a Zonar telematics control unit (TCU) pull rich diagnostic data directly from the vehicle and deliver it to Penske professionals, who use that information to keep each vehicle in top condition through better maintenance.’”

The plaintiff then alleged, “Defendants further advertise that “The Penske 24/7 Roadside Assistance team uses the near real-time diagnostic data pulled from Zonar TCUs to identify and prioritize issues.”

Additionally, the plaintiff stated, “The wireless communications perform and/or implemented by the Accused Products, among other things, transmit data over various media, evaluate channels of multiple-input-multiple-output (MIMO) wireless communications systems, compute time slot channels, generate packets for network transmissions, perform or cause to be performed error estimation in an orthogonal frequency division multiplexed (‘OFDM’) receivers, and various methods of processing OFDM symbols.”

Plaintiff presented seven claims for relief from alleged infringement of the patents-in-suit.

In the prayer for relief, the plaintiff requested permanent injunctive relief enjoining the defendants from infringement of the patents-in-suit; and an order to account for and pay to FCS all damages to and costs incurred by FCS because of Defendants’ infringing activities. The plaintiff also requested an award of reasonable ongoing royalty for future infringement of these patents.

This is a summary of a legal complaint. All statements, claims, and allegations listed herein reflect the position of the plaintiff only and do not represent the position of UniCourt. Additionally, this case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the current status of this case. To view the latest case updates and court documents, please sign up for a UniCourt account.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00210

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

Referral Judge

Roy S. Payne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fleet Connect Solutions LLC

Defendants

Penske Automotive Group, Inc.

Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P.

Penske Logistics LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jonathan Lloyd Hardt

James Francis McDonough, III

Carey Matthew Rozier

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Notice of Scheduling Conference set for 7/20/2023 09:30 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 06/14/2023. (klc, ) (Entered: 06/14/2023)

#8

(#8) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Fleet Connect Solutions LLC.( Rozier, Carey) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

7 #3

Exhibit C

7 #2

Exhibit B

7 #1

Exhibit A

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fleet Connect Solutions LLC. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(McDonough, James) (Entered: 05/17/2023)

6 #2

Summons(es)

6 #1

Summons(es)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Issued as to Penske Automotive Group, Inc., Penske Logistics LLC, Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es))(nkl, ) (Entered: 05/10/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Carey Matthew Rozier on behalf of Fleet Connect Solutions LLC (Rozier, Carey) (Entered: 05/09/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Lloyd Hardt on behalf of Fleet Connect Solutions LLC (Hardt, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/09/2023)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (McDonough, James) (Entered: 05/09/2023)

#2

(#2) Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Fleet Connect Solutions LLC (McDonough, James) (Entered: 05/09/2023)

1 #11

Summons(es) Penske Automotive Group, Inc.

1 #9

Exhibit I. Zonar Ground Traffic Control

1 #4

Exhibit D. U.S. Patent No. 7,058,040

1 #2

Exhibit B. U.S. Patent No. 7,206,837

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9490825.), filed by Fleet Connect Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. U.S. Patent No. 6,429,810, #2 Exhibit B. U.S. Patent No. 7,206,837, #3 Exhibit C. U.S. Patent No. 6,549,583, #4 Exhibit D. U.S. Patent No. 7,058,040, #5 Exhibit E. U.S. Patent No. 7,742,388, #6 Exhibit F. U.S. Patent No. 7,260,153, #7 Exhibit G. U.S. Patent No. 6,647,270, #8 Exhibit H. Zonar and Penske, Keeping your Fleet Moving, #9 Exhibit I. Zonar Ground Traffic Control, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Summons(es) Penske Automotive Group, Inc., #12 Summons(es) Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P., #13 Summons(es) Penske Logistics LLC)(McDonough, James) (Entered: 05/09/2023)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice of Scheduling Conference set for 7/20/2023 09:30 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 06/14/2023. (klc, ) (Entered: 06/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Penske Logistics LLC to 7/17/2023; Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P. to 7/17/2023; Penske Automotive Group, Inc. to 7/17/2023. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Fleet Connect Solutions LLC.( Rozier, Carey) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fleet Connect Solutions LLC. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(McDonough, James) (Entered: 05/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Issued as to Penske Automotive Group, Inc., Penske Logistics LLC, Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es))(nkl, ) (Entered: 05/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Carey Matthew Rozier on behalf of Fleet Connect Solutions LLC (Rozier, Carey) (Entered: 05/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Lloyd Hardt on behalf of Fleet Connect Solutions LLC (Hardt, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (McDonough, James) (Entered: 05/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Fleet Connect Solutions LLC (McDonough, James) (Entered: 05/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9490825.), filed by Fleet Connect Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. U.S. Patent No. 6,429,810, #2 Exhibit B. U.S. Patent No. 7,206,837, #3 Exhibit C. U.S. Patent No. 6,549,583, #4 Exhibit D. U.S. Patent No. 7,058,040, #5 Exhibit E. U.S. Patent No. 7,742,388, #6 Exhibit F. U.S. Patent No. 7,260,153, #7 Exhibit G. U.S. Patent No. 6,647,270, #8 Exhibit H. Zonar and Penske, Keeping your Fleet Moving, #9 Exhibit I. Zonar Ground Traffic Control, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Summons(es) Penske Automotive Group, Inc., #12 Summons(es) Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P., #13 Summons(es) Penske Logistics LLC)(McDonough, James) (Entered: 05/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less