This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/21/2023 at 08:09:46 (UTC).

Shaibi et al v. United States of America et al

Case Summary

On 09/22/2023 Shaibi filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Frederic Block and Marcia M. Henry. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-07067

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Frederic Block

Referral Judge

Marcia M. Henry

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ramzi Muthana Shaibi

Aden Gourmet Deli Corp.

Defendants

United States of America

United States Department of Agriculture, Food and Nutrition Service

Food and Nutrition Service

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jess M. Berkowitz

Defendant Attorney

Christopher D. Volpe

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice by Food and Nutrition Service, United States Department of Agriculture, United States of America (Volpe, Christopher) (Entered: 10/27/2023)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher D. Volpe on behalf of Food and Nutrition Service, United States Department of Agriculture, United States of America (aty to be noticed) (Volpe, Christopher) (Entered: 10/27/2023)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ramzi Muthana Shaibi, Aden Gourmet Deli Corp.. Food and Nutrition Service served on 10/10/2023, answer due 12/11/2023; United States Department of Agriculture served on 10/10/2023, answer due 12/11/2023; United States of America served on 10/10/2023, answer due 12/11/2023., SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ramzi Muthana Shaibi; Aden Gourmet Deli Corp.. Food and Nutrition Service served on 10/10/2023, answer due 12/11/2023; United States Department of Agriculture served on 10/10/2023, answer due 12/11/2023; United States of America served on 10/10/2023, answer due 12/11/2023. (Berkowitz, Jess) (Entered: 10/10/2023)

6 #2

Proposed Discovery Plan

6 #1

Individual Practice Rules

#6

(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held on 01/09/2024 at 11:00AM in Courtroom 504 North before Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry. All counsel must attend.Counsel are directed to review the attached Initial Conference Order and this Court's Individual Practice Rules for instructions. By 01/03/2024, the parties must file a joint and completed copy of the attached Proposed Discovery Plan (also available in PDF format at: # https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/local_rules/ProposedDiscoveryPlanMMH.pdf). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry on 10/05/2023.(Attachments: #1 Individual Practice Rules, #2 Proposed Discovery Plan) (RC) (Entered: 10/05/2023)

#5

(#5) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (AF) (Entered: 09/27/2023)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Food and Nutrition Service, United States Department of Agriculture and United States of America. (MI) (Entered: 09/27/2023)

#3

(#3) Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link: #https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf (AF) (Entered: 09/27/2023)

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint,, by Aden Gourmet Deli Corp., Ramzi Muthana Shaibi (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Berkowitz, Jess) (Entered: 09/22/2023)

1 #6

Exhibit Final Agency Decision

1 #5

Exhibit Attorney letter 3/28/2022

1 #4

Exhibit FNS letter 3/23/2022

1 #3

Exhibit Transaction Reports

1 #2

Exhibit FNS letter 2/25/2022

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketELECTRONIC ORDER DISMISSING CASE: See entry #9 . Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 10/27/2023. (MI) (Entered: 10/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice by Food and Nutrition Service, United States Department of Agriculture, United States of America (Volpe, Christopher) (Entered: 10/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher D. Volpe on behalf of Food and Nutrition Service, United States Department of Agriculture, United States of America (aty to be noticed) (Volpe, Christopher) (Entered: 10/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ramzi Muthana Shaibi, Aden Gourmet Deli Corp.. Food and Nutrition Service served on 10/10/2023, answer due 12/11/2023; United States Department of Agriculture served on 10/10/2023, answer due 12/11/2023; United States of America served on 10/10/2023, answer due 12/11/2023., SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ramzi Muthana Shaibi; Aden Gourmet Deli Corp.. Food and Nutrition Service served on 10/10/2023, answer due 12/11/2023; United States Department of Agriculture served on 10/10/2023, answer due 12/11/2023; United States of America served on 10/10/2023, answer due 12/11/2023. (Berkowitz, Jess) (Entered: 10/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held on 01/09/2024 at 11:00AM in Courtroom 504 North before Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry. All counsel must attend.Counsel are directed to review the attached Initial Conference Order and this Court's Individual Practice Rules for instructions. By 01/03/2024, the parties must file a joint and completed copy of the attached Proposed Discovery Plan (also available in PDF format at: # https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/local_rules/ProposedDiscoveryPlanMMH.pdf). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry on 10/05/2023.(Attachments: #1 Individual Practice Rules, #2 Proposed Discovery Plan) (RC) (Entered: 10/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (AF) (Entered: 09/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Food and Nutrition Service, United States Department of Agriculture and United States of America. (MI) (Entered: 09/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link: #https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf (AF) (Entered: 09/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023

DocketCase Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (AF) (Entered: 09/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint,, by Aden Gourmet Deli Corp., Ramzi Muthana Shaibi (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Berkowitz, Jess) (Entered: 09/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Judicial Review against United States Department of Agriculture, United States of America filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-17111872 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Ramzi Muthana Shaibi, Aden Gourmet Deli Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit FNS letter 2/25/2022, #3 Exhibit Transaction Reports, #4 Exhibit FNS letter 3/23/2022, #5 Exhibit Attorney letter 3/28/2022, #6 Exhibit Final Agency Decision) (Berkowitz, Jess) (Entered: 09/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less