This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/26/2023 at 07:25:19 (UTC).

Daigle et al v. Anco Insulations Inc et al

Case Summary

On 04/27/2023 Daigle filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Anco Insulations Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Darrel James Papillion and Michael North. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-01414

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Darrel James Papillion

Referral Judge

Michael North

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Dennis Daigle, III

Kim Lombas

Michelle Trouilliet

Eric Daigle

Patrick Daigle

3Rd Party Plaintiffs, Defendants and Cross Claimants

General Electric Company

Metropolitan Life Insurance Company

Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.

Foster Wheeler, LLC

Paramount Global

Foster Wheeler Corporation

Hopeman Brothers Inc

Liberty Mutual

Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

Defendants and Cross Claimants

Foster Wheeler, LLC

Paramount Global

Hopeman Brothers Inc

3Rd Party Defendant and Cross Defendant

Huntington Ingalls Incorporated

17 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Damon R. Pourciau

3Rd Party Plaintiff, Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

John Joseph Hainkel, III

Angela M. Bowlin

Kelly L. Long

Kelsey Eagan

Magali Ann Puente-Martin

Roth Martin Hainkel

Kaye N. Courington

April Ann McQuillar

Blaine Augusta Moore

Brittney Bullock Ankersen

Jeffrey Matthew Burg

Mathilde Villere Semmes

Troy Nathan Bell

Jay Morton Jalenak, Jr.

Patrick Dale Roquemore

3Rd Party Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

Gustave A. Fritchie, III

Other Attorneys

Margaret M. Joffe

Kenan S. Rand, Jr

Shelley L. Thompson

7 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#39

(#39) Summons Issued as to Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (ko) (Entered: 06/23/2023)

#38

(#38) Request of Summons Issued as to Huntington Ingalls Incorporated(R. Doc 34) filed by Hopeman Brothers Inc re #34 Third Party Complaint. (Ankersen, Brittney) (Entered: 06/22/2023)

#37

(#37) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Darrel James Papillion. Judge Susie Morgan no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on June 22, 2023.(mp) (Entered: 06/22/2023)

#36

(#36) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated(R. Doc 23), Huntington Ingalls Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Huntington Ingalls Industries, Inc. for Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated (Melancon, David) (Entered: 06/21/2023)

#35

(#35) Summons Issued as to Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust(R. Doc 34). (cs) (Entered: 06/15/2023)

#34

(#34) CROSS-CLAIM against Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, and THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust. filed by Hopeman Brothers Inc.(cs) (Entered: 06/15/2023)

#33

(#33) ORDER granting #32 Motion for Leave to File Cross-Claim and Third-Party Demand. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 06/15/2023. (cs) (Entered: 06/15/2023)

32 #1

Memorandum in Support

#32

(#32) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Cross-Claim and Third-Party Demand by Hopeman Brothers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Pleading Cross-Claim and Third-Party Demand)(Ankersen, Brittney) (Entered: 06/13/2023)

#5

(#9) **DEFICIENT** Summons submitted for Issuance as to Huntington Ingalls Incorporated filed by General Electric Company re #5 Third Party Complaint. (Hainkel, Roth) (Main Document 9 replaced on 5/19/2023) (mmv). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/19/2023: #1 Exhibit) (mmv). Modified text/event on 5/19/2023 (mmv). Modified on 5/19/2023 (mmv). (Entered: 05/19/2023)

#4

(#4) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Case reassigned to Judge Wendy B Vitter. Judge Lance M Africk no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 05/01/2023.(js) (Entered: 05/01/2023)

#3

(#7) Notice of Compliance re #3 Directive of the Clerk by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record)(Ankersen, Brittney) Modified text on 5/11/2023 (mmv). (Entered: 05/10/2023)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Notice of Removal State Court Notice of Removal

1 #3

Exhibit C-LASH subcontract/specs

1 #2

Exhibit B-Dennis Daigle depo transcript

1 #1

Exhibit A-Petition

#1

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal Original Petition for Damages, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by General Electric Company. Attorney Roth Martin Hainkel added to party General Electric Company(pty:dft).(Hainkel, Roth) Modified text on 5/8/2023 (mmv). (Entered: 05/05/2023)

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) Summons Issued as to Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (ko) (Entered: 06/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) Request of Summons Issued as to Huntington Ingalls Incorporated(R. Doc 34) filed by Hopeman Brothers Inc re #34 Third Party Complaint. (Ankersen, Brittney) (Entered: 06/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Darrel James Papillion. Judge Susie Morgan no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on June 22, 2023.(mp) (Entered: 06/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated(R. Doc 23), Huntington Ingalls Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Huntington Ingalls Industries, Inc. for Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated (Melancon, David) (Entered: 06/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Summons Issued as to Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust(R. Doc 34). (cs) (Entered: 06/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) CROSS-CLAIM against Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, and THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust. filed by Hopeman Brothers Inc.(cs) (Entered: 06/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ORDER granting #32 Motion for Leave to File Cross-Claim and Third-Party Demand. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 06/15/2023. (cs) (Entered: 06/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Cross-Claim and Third-Party Demand by Hopeman Brothers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Pleading Cross-Claim and Third-Party Demand)(Ankersen, Brittney) (Entered: 06/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #28 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer is GRANTED. Huntington Ingalls Incorporated is hereby granted an extension of time, through and including July 21, 2023, within which to respond to the cross-claims asserted by Paramount Global and Foster Wheeler LLC. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 06/12/2023. (js) (Entered: 06/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Summons Issued as to Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (js) (Entered: 06/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) **DEFICIENT** Summons submitted for Issuance as to Huntington Ingalls Incorporated filed by General Electric Company re #5 Third Party Complaint. (Hainkel, Roth) (Main Document 9 replaced on 5/19/2023) (mmv). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/19/2023: #1 Exhibit) (mmv). Modified text/event on 5/19/2023 (mmv). Modified on 5/19/2023 (mmv). (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 Notice of Compliance. **Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should thedocument you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document to document 3.** (mmv) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Compliance re #3 Directive of the Clerk by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record)(Ankersen, Brittney) Modified text on 5/11/2023 (mmv). (Entered: 05/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by General Electric Company (Hainkel, Roth) (Entered: 05/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal Original Petition for Damages, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by General Electric Company. Attorney Roth Martin Hainkel added to party General Electric Company(pty:dft).(Hainkel, Roth) Modified text on 5/8/2023 (mmv). (Entered: 05/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Case reassigned to Judge Wendy B Vitter. Judge Lance M Africk no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 05/01/2023.(js) (Entered: 05/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal. (mmm) (Entered: 04/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (mb) (Entered: 04/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketFiling fee received from Brittney Bullock Ankersen: Receipt No. ALAEDC-9913888, $ 402.00 (mb) (Entered: 04/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for Orleans Parish, case number 2023-01414 (Credit Card not accepted or unavailable - payment of filing fee due within 2 business days) filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Wayne Manufacutring Corp.). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Petition, #2 Exhibit B-Dennis Daigle depo transcript, #3 Exhibit C-LASH subcontract/specs, #4 Notice of Removal State Court Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Brittney Bullock Ankersen added to party Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Wayne Manufacutring Corp.)(pty:dft).(Ankersen, Brittney) (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/28/2023) (mmm). (Entered: 04/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less