This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/23/2023 at 09:28:43 (UTC).

Burch v. Greenwich Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 08/24/2023 Burch filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Greenwich Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Marcia A. Crone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00320

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marcia A. Crone

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David Burch

Defendant

Greenwich Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Evette Mercedes Hooper

Jason John Ruen

Ryan Nicholas Berchelmann

Defendant Attorneys

Nicole Marie Hilburn

Sara Elizabeth Nau

 

Court Documents

10 #1

Exhibit 1

#10

(#10) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hilburn, Nicole) (Entered: 10/20/2023)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by David Burch Certificate of Written Discovery (Hooper, Evette) (Entered: 10/17/2023)

8 #1

Affidavit/Declaration Affidavits

#8

(#8) NOTICE by David Burch Plaintiff's Formal Notice of Filing of Affidavits and Records as to Necessity of Services and Reasonableness of Charges (Attachments: #1 Affidavit/Declaration Affidavits)(Hooper, Evette) (Entered: 10/17/2023)

#7

(#7) Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by David Burch (Hooper, Evette) (Entered: 09/22/2023)

#6

(#6) ORDERED that Rule 26(f) Attorney Conference must occur by 10/6/2023. Joint written report filed no later than October 20, 2023. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 9/8/2023. (bjc, ) (Entered: 09/11/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Evette Mercedes Hooper on behalf of David Burch (Hooper, Evette) (Entered: 09/07/2023)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Greenwich Insurance Company.(Nau, Sara) (Entered: 08/25/2023)

#3

(#3) ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT AND IS INCLUDED IN THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL.*** PETITION against Greenwich Insurance Company.(bjc, ) (Entered: 08/25/2023)

#2

(#2) Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Greenwich Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent XL Group Ltd., Corporate Parent X.L. America Inc., Corporate Parent XL Financial Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent XL Bermuda Ltd., Corporate Parent AXA S.A. for Greenwich Insurance Company. (Nau, Sara) (Entered: 08/24/2023)

1 #6

Exhibit 5

1 #5

Exhibit 4

1 #4

Exhibit 3

1 #3

Exhibit 2

1 #2

Exhibit 1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hilburn, Nicole) (Entered: 10/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by David Burch Certificate of Written Discovery (Hooper, Evette) (Entered: 10/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE by David Burch Plaintiff's Formal Notice of Filing of Affidavits and Records as to Necessity of Services and Reasonableness of Charges (Attachments: #1 Affidavit/Declaration Affidavits)(Hooper, Evette) (Entered: 10/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2023

DocketNOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling/Case Management Conference set for 11/3/2023 at 04:00 PM in Ctrm 3 (Beaumont) before District Judge Marcia A. Crone. Counsel must appear in person.(jc, ) (Entered: 10/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by David Burch (Hooper, Evette) (Entered: 09/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) ORDERED that Rule 26(f) Attorney Conference must occur by 10/6/2023. Joint written report filed no later than October 20, 2023. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 9/8/2023. (bjc, ) (Entered: 09/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Evette Mercedes Hooper on behalf of David Burch (Hooper, Evette) (Entered: 09/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Greenwich Insurance Company.(Nau, Sara) (Entered: 08/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023

DocketThe following attorney was contacted on 8/25/2023 by email regarding admission requirements to the Eastern District of Texas: Plaintiff's attorney Kristen R Weaver. (bjc, ) (Entered: 08/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023

DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (bjc, ) (Entered: 08/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023

DocketCase assigned to District Judge Marcia A. Crone. (bjc, ) (Entered: 08/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT AND IS INCLUDED IN THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL.*** PETITION against Greenwich Insurance Company.(bjc, ) (Entered: 08/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023

DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by David Burch. (bjc, ) (Entered: 08/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Greenwich Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent XL Group Ltd., Corporate Parent X.L. America Inc., Corporate Parent XL Financial Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent XL Bermuda Ltd., Corporate Parent AXA S.A. for Greenwich Insurance Company. (Nau, Sara) (Entered: 08/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Greenwich Insurance Company from 75th Judicial Court, case number 23DC-CV-01010. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9671212), filed by Greenwich Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Nau, Sara) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/25/2023 with flattened image) (bjc, ). (Entered: 08/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less