This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/09/2023 at 07:20:49 (UTC).

Thatcher v. Publix Super Markets, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/10/2023 Thatcher filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Publix Super Markets, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-01528

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas W. Thrash, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SheAnna Thatcher

Defendants

Publix Super Markets, Inc.

ABC Corp. #1-3

John Does #1-3

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Alex Johnson

Defendant Attorneys

Evelyn Graham

Joseph Menello

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Publix Super Markets, Inc. Discovery ends on 9/7/2023. Originally filed with State Court of Cobb County on 02/22/2023(tht) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 04/10/2023)

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

Exhibit A

#4

(#4) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Publix Super Markets, Inc.. (Menello, Joseph) (Entered: 04/19/2023)

#5

(#5) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Publix Super Markets, Inc.. (Menello, Joseph) (Entered: 05/09/2023)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE 26.3 by Publix Super Markets, Inc..(Menello, Joseph) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

7 #7

Main Document

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Initial Disclosures by Publix Super Markets, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A: Defendant's Witness List, #2 Exhibit Attachment C: Documents and Disclosures)(Menello, Joseph) (Entered: 05/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE 26.3 by Publix Super Markets, Inc..(Menello, Joseph) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Publix Super Markets, Inc.. (Menello, Joseph) (Entered: 05/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Notation re #4 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Reviewed and approved by Judge Thrash. (jeh) (Entered: 04/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Publix Super Markets, Inc.. (Menello, Joseph) (Entered: 04/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE Of Filing by Publix Super Markets, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Menello, Joseph) (Entered: 04/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Publix Super Markets, Inc. Discovery ends on 9/7/2023. Originally filed with State Court of Cobb County on 02/22/2023(tht) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 04/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Publix Super Markets, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-12517091) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(tht) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 04/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less