This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/20/2023 at 14:49:45 (UTC).

Walker v. Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/21/2023 Walker filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Johnson Johnson Consumer Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephen R. Bough. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:23-CV-00663

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen R. Bough

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Walker

Defendants

Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.

Kenvue Inc.

Procter & Gamble Company, The

Reckitt Benckiser LLC

Wal-Mart Stores East 1, LP

Wal-Mart, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bradley D. Honnold

Kirk J Goza

Robert A. Horn

Taylor Foye

Joseph A. Kronawitter

Thomas P. Cartmell

Tyler Hudson

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher J. Schmidt

Kristen A. Cooke

Beth C. Boggs

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Kenvue Inc., Procter & Gamble Company, The, Reckitt Benckiser LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East 1, LP, Wal-Mart, Inc. filed by Joseph A. Kronawitter on behalf of Michael Walker. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-8635792. Service due by 12/20/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kronawitter, Joseph) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to outside neutral category II. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

2 #1

MAP General Order

#3

(#3) NOTICE of appearance by Christopher J. Schmidt on behalf of Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Kenvue Inc. (Attorney Christopher J. Schmidt added to party Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J. Schmidt added to party Kenvue Inc.(pty:dft))(Schmidt, Christopher) (Entered: 10/20/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of appearance by Kristen A. Cooke on behalf of Reckitt Benckiser LLC (Attorney Kristen A. Cooke added to party Reckitt Benckiser LLC(pty:dft))(Cooke, Kristen) (Entered: 10/24/2023)

#5

(#5) Joint MOTION to stay Proceedings or, in the Alternative, For Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Kristen A. Cooke on behalf of Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Reckitt Benckiser LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/7/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Cooke, Kristen) (Entered: 10/24/2023)

#6

(#6) SUGGESTIONS in support re #5 Joint MOTION to stay Proceedings or, in the Alternative, For Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Kristen A. Cooke on behalf of Defendants Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Reckitt Benckiser LLC. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Cooke, Kristen) (Entered: 10/24/2023)

#7

(#7) MOTION to reassign/transfer case MOTION TO TRANSFER/REASSIGN PURSUANT TO L.R. 89.3(c)(4) filed by Thomas P. Cartmell on behalf of Michael Walker. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/8/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Cartmell, Thomas) (Entered: 10/25/2023)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of appearance by Beth C. Boggs on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East 1, LP, Wal-Mart, Inc. (Attorney Beth C. Boggs added to party Wal-Mart Stores East 1, LP(pty:dft), Attorney Beth C. Boggs added to party Wal-Mart, Inc.(pty:dft))(Boggs, Beth) (Entered: 10/30/2023)

#9

(#9) Joint MOTION for extension of time to file answer filed by Beth C. Boggs on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East 1, LP, Wal-Mart, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/13/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Boggs, Beth) (Entered: 10/30/2023)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #7 motion to reassign/transfer case. For good cause shown and with the consent of the Honorable Stephen R. Bough, United States District Judge, the Motion to Transfer is GRANTED and the above referenced case is hereby transferred to Judge Bough for all further proceedings. Signed on 11/1/2023 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Houston, Kiambu) (Entered: 11/01/2023)

 

Docket Entries

11/01/2023

Docket(#12) First, before the Court is Defendants RB Health (US) LLC (RB Health) and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s (JJCI) Partially-Unopposed Motion to Stay Proceedings or, in the Alternative, for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. (Doc. #5.) Upon review, RB Health and JJCI's request for a stay is DENIED. However, RB Health and JJCI's request for an extension of time to respond to the complaint is GRANTED. Second, before the Court is Defendants Walmart Inc. and Wal-Mart Stores East, LPs (collectively, Walmart") Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. (Doc. #9.) Upon review, the motion is GRANTED. Therefore, it is hereby ORDERED that RB Health, JJCI, and Walmart may respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before 30 days after the JPML issues its decision on the pending motion to transfer pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. Signed on 11/1/23 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Diefenbach, Tracy) (Entered: 11/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2023

Docket(#11) ORDER TRANSFERRING/REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Stephen R. Bough for all further proceedings. District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr no longer assigned to case. Please note the new case number: 4:23-00663-CV-SRB. Signed on 11/1/2023 by Clerk of Court. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Houston, Kiambu) (Entered: 11/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) ORDER granting #7 motion to reassign/transfer case. For good cause shown and with the consent of the Honorable Stephen R. Bough, United States District Judge, the Motion to Transfer is GRANTED and the above referenced case is hereby transferred to Judge Bough for all further proceedings. Signed on 11/1/2023 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Houston, Kiambu) (Entered: 11/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) Joint MOTION for extension of time to file answer filed by Beth C. Boggs on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East 1, LP, Wal-Mart, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/13/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Boggs, Beth) (Entered: 10/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE of appearance by Beth C. Boggs on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East 1, LP, Wal-Mart, Inc. (Attorney Beth C. Boggs added to party Wal-Mart Stores East 1, LP(pty:dft), Attorney Beth C. Boggs added to party Wal-Mart, Inc.(pty:dft))(Boggs, Beth) (Entered: 10/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) MOTION to reassign/transfer case MOTION TO TRANSFER/REASSIGN PURSUANT TO L.R. 89.3(c)(4) filed by Thomas P. Cartmell on behalf of Michael Walker. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/8/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Cartmell, Thomas) (Entered: 10/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) SUGGESTIONS in support re #5 Joint MOTION to stay Proceedings or, in the Alternative, For Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Kristen A. Cooke on behalf of Defendants Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Reckitt Benckiser LLC. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Cooke, Kristen) (Entered: 10/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Joint MOTION to stay Proceedings or, in the Alternative, For Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Kristen A. Cooke on behalf of Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Reckitt Benckiser LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/7/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Cooke, Kristen) (Entered: 10/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE of appearance by Kristen A. Cooke on behalf of Reckitt Benckiser LLC (Attorney Kristen A. Cooke added to party Reckitt Benckiser LLC(pty:dft))(Cooke, Kristen) (Entered: 10/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE of appearance by Christopher J. Schmidt on behalf of Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Kenvue Inc. (Attorney Christopher J. Schmidt added to party Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J. Schmidt added to party Kenvue Inc.(pty:dft))(Schmidt, Christopher) (Entered: 10/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants. (Melvin, Greg) (Entered: 09/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to outside neutral category II. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Kenvue Inc., Procter & Gamble Company, The, Reckitt Benckiser LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East 1, LP, Wal-Mart, Inc. filed by Joseph A. Kronawitter on behalf of Michael Walker. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-8635792. Service due by 12/20/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kronawitter, Joseph) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less