This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/14/2023 at 13:30:26 (UTC).

CRUDUP v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al

Case Summary

On 09/15/2023 CRUDUP filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against JOHNSON JOHNSON. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael A. Shipp and Rukhsanah L. Singh. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-20406

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael A. Shipp

Referral Judge

Rukhsanah L. Singh

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMIE CRUDUP

Defendants

JOHNSON & JOHNSON

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC.

LTL MANAGEMENT, LLC

KENVUE, INC.

JOHNSON & JOHNSON HOLDCO (NA) INC.

JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

In Re

JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES, AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRITTANY SAMANTHA SCOTT

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON HOLDCO (NA) INC., KENVUE, INC., LTL MANAGEMENT, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14696427) with JURY DEMAND, filed by AMIE CRUDUP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SCOTT, BRITTANY) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON HOLDCO (NA) INC., KENVUE, INC., LTL MANAGEMENT, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jjc, ) (Entered: 09/18/2023)

 

Docket Entries

10/20/2023

DocketMember Case Direct File on 9/15/2023, for MDL 2738 Party JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES, AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION added. (jxh, ) (Entered: 10/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON HOLDCO (NA) INC., KENVUE, INC., LTL MANAGEMENT, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jjc, ) (Entered: 09/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON HOLDCO (NA) INC., KENVUE, INC., LTL MANAGEMENT, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14696427) with JURY DEMAND, filed by AMIE CRUDUP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SCOTT, BRITTANY) (Entered: 09/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less