This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/08/2023 at 06:47:09 (UTC).

Headwater Research LLC v. AT&T Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/01/2023 Headwater Research LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against AT T Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Rodney Gilstrap and Roy S. Payne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00398

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

Referral Judge

Roy S. Payne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Headwater Research LLC

Defendants

AT&T Inc.

AT&T Services, Inc.

AT&T Mobility, LLC

AT&T Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Benjamin T Wang

Marc A Fenster

Brian D Ledahl

Amy Elizabeth Hayden

James Shrin Tsuei

Jason Wietholter

Neil Alan Rubin

Paul Anthony Kroeger

Philip X Wang

Kristopher Ryan Davis

Reza Mirzaie

Robert Christopher Bunt

Defendant Attorney

Deron R Dacus

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) CONSOLIDATION ORDER - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues with the LEAD CASE, Case No. 2:23-cv-00397. All parties are instructed file any future filings in the LEAD CASE. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/2/2023. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/02/2023)

#24

(#24) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Christopher Bunt on behalf of Headwater Research LLC (Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 10/10/2023)

#23

(#23) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re AT&T Mobility, LLC.( Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 09/25/2023)

#22

(#22) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re AT&T Corp..( Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 09/25/2023)

#21

(#21) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re AT&T Inc., AT&T Services, Inc..( Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 09/25/2023)

#20

(#20) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Headwater Research LLC. AT&T Mobility, LLC served on 9/14/2023, answer due 10/5/2023. (Fenster, Marc) (Entered: 09/22/2023)

#19

(#19) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Headwater Research LLC. AT&T Corp. served on 9/8/2023, answer due 9/29/2023. (Fenster, Marc) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

6 #1

Additional Attachment(s)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Marc A Fenster on behalf of Headwater Research LLC (Fenster, Marc) (Entered: 09/01/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE by Headwater Research LLC Notice of Related Cases (Fenster, Marc) (Entered: 09/01/2023)

#3

(#3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Headwater Research LLC (Fenster, Marc) (Entered: 09/01/2023)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Fenster, Marc) (Entered: 09/01/2023)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility, LLC, AT&T Services, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9685141.), filed by Headwater Research LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fenster, Marc) (Entered: 09/01/2023)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#25) CONSOLIDATION ORDER - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues with the LEAD CASE, Case No. 2:23-cv-00397. All parties are instructed file any future filings in the LEAD CASE. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/2/2023. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#24) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Christopher Bunt on behalf of Headwater Research LLC (Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 10/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023

DocketDefendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for AT&T Mobility, LLC to 11/13/2023. 39 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) (Entered: 09/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023

DocketDefendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for AT&T Corp. to 11/13/2023. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) (Entered: 09/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023

DocketDefendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for AT&T Services, Inc. to 11/13/2023; AT&T Inc. to 11/13/2023. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) (Entered: 09/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#23) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re AT&T Mobility, LLC.( Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 09/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#22) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re AT&T Corp..( Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 09/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#21) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re AT&T Inc., AT&T Services, Inc..( Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 09/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#20) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Headwater Research LLC. AT&T Mobility, LLC served on 9/14/2023, answer due 10/5/2023. (Fenster, Marc) (Entered: 09/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#19) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Headwater Research LLC. AT&T Corp. served on 9/8/2023, answer due 9/29/2023. (Fenster, Marc) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
09/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian D Ledahl on behalf of Headwater Research LLC (Ledahl, Brian) (Entered: 09/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Reza Mirzaie on behalf of Headwater Research LLC (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 09/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) SUMMONS Issued as to AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility, LLC, AT&T Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Additional Attachment(s), #2 Additional Attachment(s), #3 Additional Attachment(s))(nkl, ) (Entered: 09/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023

DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, ) (Entered: 09/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023

DocketCase Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (nkl, ) (Entered: 09/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Marc A Fenster on behalf of Headwater Research LLC (Fenster, Marc) (Entered: 09/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE by Headwater Research LLC Notice of Related Cases (Fenster, Marc) (Entered: 09/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Headwater Research LLC (Fenster, Marc) (Entered: 09/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Fenster, Marc) (Entered: 09/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against AT&T Corp., AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility, LLC, AT&T Services, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9685141.), filed by Headwater Research LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fenster, Marc) (Entered: 09/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less