This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/27/2023 at 09:12:12 (UTC).

Merch Traffic, LLC v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A

Case Summary

On 06/28/2023 Merch Traffic, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is John J. Tharp, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-04165

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John J. Tharp, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Merch Traffic, LLC

Defendants

The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A

Abi Poster Store

Anime Design Factory Store

Anime Streetwear Store

Chevy Store

Danangua Store

Eharlien Official Store

Eleanos Art Store

erdongH Store

GDD Store

Good Quality Clothes K2 Store

Heavydun Official Store

High quality clothing XB335 Store

JellyCase Store

Kavsenraies Factory Store

KK07 Store

Lavendercases Store

Linerken Factory Store

Lulikaby Factory Store

111 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amy Crout Ziegler

Justin R. Gaudio

Berel Yonathan Lakovitsky

Justin Tyler Joseph

 

Court Documents

#37

(#37) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Plaintiff's motion for entry of default and default judgment #34 is taken under advisement. Any objections or responses are due by 9/4/23. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 08/23/2023)

36 #1

Exhibit 1

#36

(#36) DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion #35 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Joseph, Justin) (Entered: 08/22/2023)

35 #1

Exhibit 1

#35

(#35) MEMORANDUM by Merch Traffic, LLC in support of motion for entry of default, motion for default judgment #34 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Joseph, Justin) (Entered: 08/22/2023)

34 #1

Exhibit A

#34

(#34) MOTION by Plaintiff Merch Traffic, LLC for entry of default , MOTION by Plaintiff Merch Traffic, LLC for default judgment as to all Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Joseph, Justin) (Entered: 08/22/2023)

#33

(#33) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Upon receipt of the plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal #32 and pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i), defendant no. 53 is dismissed from this case. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 08/11/2023)

#32

(#32) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Merch Traffic, LLC as to certain defendant (Joseph, Justin) (Entered: 08/10/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Merch Traffic, LLC (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 06/28/2023)

#4

(#4) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 06/28/2023)

#3

(#3) MOTION by Plaintiff Merch Traffic, LLC for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 06/28/2023)

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#2) SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Merch Traffic, LLC Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 06/28/2023)

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#37) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Plaintiff's motion for entry of default and default judgment #34 is taken under advisement. Any objections or responses are due by 9/4/23. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 08/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#36) DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion #35 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Joseph, Justin) (Entered: 08/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#35) MEMORANDUM by Merch Traffic, LLC in support of motion for entry of default, motion for default judgment #34 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Joseph, Justin) (Entered: 08/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#34) MOTION by Plaintiff Merch Traffic, LLC for entry of default , MOTION by Plaintiff Merch Traffic, LLC for default judgment as to all Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Joseph, Justin) (Entered: 08/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#33) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Upon receipt of the plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal #32 and pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i), defendant no. 53 is dismissed from this case. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 08/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#32) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Merch Traffic, LLC as to certain defendant (Joseph, Justin) (Entered: 08/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#31) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merch Traffic, LLC as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A on 7/28/2023, answer due 8/18/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Berel Y. Lakovitsky, #2 Exhibit A)(Lakovitsky, Berel) (Entered: 07/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#30) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Upon receipt of the plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal #29 and pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i), defendants numbers 44, 85, 87, and 88 are dismissed from this case. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 07/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#29) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Merch Traffic, LLC as to certain defendants (Joseph, Justin) (Entered: 07/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023

DocketNEW PARTIES: Abi Poster Store, Anime Design Factory Store, Anime Streetwear Store, Chevy Store, Danangua Store, Eharlien Official Store, Eleanos Art Store, erdongH Store, GDD Store, Good Quality Clothes K2 Store, Heavydun Official Store, High quality clothing XB335 Store, JellyCase Store, Kavsenraies Factory Store, KK07 Store, Lavendercases Store, Linerken Factory Store, Lulikaby Factory Store, qiyue007 Store, Shop1102374506 Store, Shop1102435364 Store, Shop1102439310 Store, Shop1102440288 Store, Shop1102525698 Store, Shop1102694493 Store, Shop1102697437 Store, Shop1102709318 Store, Shop1102712311 Store, Shop1102713298 Store, Shop1102714256 Store, Shop1102714264 Store, Shop1102753347 Store, Shop5259129 Store, Shop910558321 Store, Shop911884165 Store, Simpleguy Store, Skull Island Store, The 1990 Phone Cases Store, WGTD Tshirt 2 Store, XHL Store, Yingke Store, ZJTHREEZJ Store, ZKK Store, AUGETY, chenguanqingsdyt, chenjiafuksjdk, douxingbiao59977, foshanshinanhaiquliulvshangmaoyouxiangongsi, FXCNIUBI, gaokuanzzsf, guangzhoushuishangshangmaoyouxiangongsi, HEFANCC, hefeixiongyushangmaoyouxiangong, HuangYicai Art, kunmingqianxuanjingmaoyouxiangongsi, licongcongs, Linweixiong Art, LiuLSGMT, Pataishangmaoyouxiangongsi, sichuanyunhaojiachengkejiyouxiangongsi, This is a late night shop, wanzaixianyizhichaobaihuo, wujianmingyys, wujingyuanolmk, XUEXXX, yangyuesjhdjz, youzhangteuuww, ZENGDAXT, Zhuzyu Art, Allegroo, Angorabest, Braces, Cansonglai, Charle, Eei9, H151, Hongpingguog, Luweiha, P94y, Pjpx, R5k1, Sjvb, V6s0, Yachtt, BINFA-Wall Art, jiujiangyonghanmuxiaoshou Co.ltd, Ningboshi Dajidianzikeji Co.ltd, zhengzhousankecongshangmao Co.ltd, 19830923WWFG, asdasd125454, baoxiaolong8084, d4g5g55, Daniel D Murphy, Duanliuliu78523, dunaizhi2221, efwqbj, Enrique McDaniels, gutao135134, guyueyue, Hhkkj, huigui, huwenjing fashion, limingrong8338, liuxiaohai39058, liuzilong40921, Marjorie D Blount, Panshunhong3399, qiuhan31791, Rosa Gonzalez66, siyan583, Vendoudu Toys, wangrongkun24092, wangzeqi0505, wanxianzongqin, weimeiyue6688, wuguangying, wuhuilingg, xiao jun 668, xushengfei1073, yanruohan668, YINPING678, yuanhaiqin15245, zhangguotao14776, zhangming520, zhangxiaoying31217, zhaoxinming, zhaozhijie55322, zhongjian78154 and zhoufeng55200 added to case caption. (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 07/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
06/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Merch Traffic, LLC by Berel Yonathan Lakovitsky (Lakovitsky, Berel) (Entered: 06/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Merch Traffic, LLC by Justin Tyler Joseph (Joseph, Justin) (Entered: 06/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Merch Traffic, LLC by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 06/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Merch Traffic, LLC by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 06/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by Merch Traffic, LLC (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 06/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Merch Traffic, LLC (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 06/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 06/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) MOTION by Plaintiff Merch Traffic, LLC for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 06/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Merch Traffic, LLC Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 06/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Merch Traffic, LLC; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20783431. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 06/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less