This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/14/2023 at 07:41:58 (UTC).

AMERICAN CASUALTY COMPANY OF READING, PA v. NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 08/15/2023 AMERICAN CASUALTY COMPANY OF READING, PA filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Kevin McNulty and Edward S. Kiel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-04611

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kevin McNulty

Referral Judge

Edward S. Kiel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN CASUALTY COMPANY OF READING, PA

Defendants

NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY

GEMINI INSURANCE COMPANY

AMERICAN EMPIRE SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY

ENDURANCE AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JANET JAKYUNG LEE

Defendant Attorneys

HENRI MARCEL

WARD ANDREW RIVERS

ROBERT THOMAS GUNNING

ALYSE EVA BERGER HEILPERN

DAVID M. KUPFER

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN EMPIRE SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Great American Insurance Company as Corporate Parent.. (BERGER HEILPERN, ALYSE) (Entered: 10/05/2023)

#16

(#16) ANSWER to Complaint by AMERICAN EMPIRE SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY.(BERGER HEILPERN, ALYSE) (Entered: 10/05/2023)

#15

(#15) Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney WILLIAM A. RUBERT terminated. (RUBERT, WILLIAM) (Entered: 10/05/2023)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by WARD ANDREW RIVERS on behalf of NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY (RIVERS, WARD) (Entered: 10/05/2023)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by HENRI MARCEL on behalf of NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY (MARCEL, HENRI) (Entered: 10/05/2023)

#12

(#12) APPLICATION/PETITION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or otherwise Reply for by NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY. (RUBERT, WILLIAM) (Entered: 10/04/2023)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM A. RUBERT on behalf of NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY (RUBERT, WILLIAM) (Entered: 10/04/2023)

#10

(#10) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company's Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond. Attorney DAVID M. KUPFER for ENDURANCE AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY added. (KUPFER, DAVID) (Entered: 10/04/2023)

8 #1

Statement Disclosure statement

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by GEMINI INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Statement Disclosure statement)(GUNNING, ROBERT) (Entered: 09/25/2023)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by AMERICAN CASUALTY COMPANY OF READING, PA. ENDURANCE AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY served on 9/14/2023, answer due 10/5/2023. (LEE, JANET) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by AMERICAN CASUALTY COMPANY OF READING, PA. AMERICAN EMPIRE SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY served on 9/14/2023, answer due 10/5/2023. (LEE, JANET) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by AMERICAN CASUALTY COMPANY OF READING, PA. GEMINI INSURANCE COMPANY served on 9/14/2023, answer due 10/5/2023. (LEE, JANET) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by AMERICAN CASUALTY COMPANY OF READING, PA. NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY served on 9/14/2023, answer due 10/5/2023. (LEE, JANET) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to AMERICAN EMPIRE SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY, ENDURANCE AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, GEMINI INSURANCE COMPANY, NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sm) (Entered: 08/16/2023)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN CASUALTY COMPANY OF READING, PA. (LEE, JANET) (Entered: 08/15/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14529059), filed by AMERICAN CASUALTY COMPANY OF READING, PA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LEE, JANET) (Entered: 08/15/2023)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN EMPIRE SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Great American Insurance Company as Corporate Parent.. (BERGER HEILPERN, ALYSE) (Entered: 10/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) ANSWER to Complaint by AMERICAN EMPIRE SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY.(BERGER HEILPERN, ALYSE) (Entered: 10/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketClerk`s Text Order - The document #12 submitted by NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/18/2023. (sm) (Entered: 10/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketClerk`s Text Order - The document #10 submitted by ENDURANCE AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/19/2023. (sm) (Entered: 10/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney WILLIAM A. RUBERT terminated. (RUBERT, WILLIAM) (Entered: 10/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by WARD ANDREW RIVERS on behalf of NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY (RIVERS, WARD) (Entered: 10/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by HENRI MARCEL on behalf of NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY (MARCEL, HENRI) (Entered: 10/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) APPLICATION/PETITION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or otherwise Reply for by NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY. (RUBERT, WILLIAM) (Entered: 10/04/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM A. RUBERT on behalf of NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY (RUBERT, WILLIAM) (Entered: 10/04/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company's Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond. Attorney DAVID M. KUPFER for ENDURANCE AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY added. (KUPFER, DAVID) (Entered: 10/04/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEMINI INSURANCE COMPANY. (GUNNING, ROBERT) (Entered: 09/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by GEMINI INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Statement Disclosure statement)(GUNNING, ROBERT) (Entered: 09/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by AMERICAN CASUALTY COMPANY OF READING, PA. ENDURANCE AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY served on 9/14/2023, answer due 10/5/2023. (LEE, JANET) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by AMERICAN CASUALTY COMPANY OF READING, PA. AMERICAN EMPIRE SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY served on 9/14/2023, answer due 10/5/2023. (LEE, JANET) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by AMERICAN CASUALTY COMPANY OF READING, PA. GEMINI INSURANCE COMPANY served on 9/14/2023, answer due 10/5/2023. (LEE, JANET) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by AMERICAN CASUALTY COMPANY OF READING, PA. NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY served on 9/14/2023, answer due 10/5/2023. (LEE, JANET) (Entered: 09/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to AMERICAN EMPIRE SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY, ENDURANCE AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, GEMINI INSURANCE COMPANY, NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sm) (Entered: 08/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023

DocketJudge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel added. (ps) (Entered: 08/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN CASUALTY COMPANY OF READING, PA. (LEE, JANET) (Entered: 08/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14529059), filed by AMERICAN CASUALTY COMPANY OF READING, PA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LEE, JANET) (Entered: 08/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less