This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/14/2023 at 08:13:11 (UTC).

Leeds v. EVFoods, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/15/2023 Leeds filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against EVFoods, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew L. Carter, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-07191

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew L. Carter, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jason Leeds

Defendants

Max Crespo

Bradley Robinson

EVFoods, LLC

ADP Totalsource Co. XXI Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Corey Scott Stark

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against ADP TOTALSOURCE CO. XXI INC., Max Crespo, EVFOODS, LLC,, Bradley Robinson. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28147633)Document filed by Jason Leeds..(Stark, Corey) (Entered: 08/15/2023)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to EVFOODS, LLC, ADP TOTALSOURCE CO. XXI INC., MAX CRESPO, and BRADLEY ROBINSON, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jason Leeds..(Stark, Corey) (Entered: 08/15/2023)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Stark, Corey) (Entered: 08/15/2023)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to ADP Totalsource Co. XXI Inc, Max Crespo, EVFoods, LLC, Bradley Robinson. (vf) (Entered: 08/16/2023)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. EVFoods, LLC waiver sent on 8/21/2023, answer due 10/20/2023. Document filed by Jason Leeds..(Stark, Corey) (Entered: 09/06/2023)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Max Crespo waiver sent on 8/21/2023, answer due 10/20/2023. Document filed by Jason Leeds..(Stark, Corey) (Entered: 09/06/2023)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Bradley Robinson waiver sent on 8/21/2023, answer due 10/20/2023. Document filed by Jason Leeds..(Stark, Corey) (Entered: 09/06/2023)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. ADP Totalsource Co. XXI Inc waiver sent on 9/20/2023, answer due 11/20/2023. Document filed by Jason Leeds..(Stark, Corey) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

 

Docket Entries

09/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. ADP Totalsource Co. XXI Inc waiver sent on 9/20/2023, answer due 11/20/2023. Document filed by Jason Leeds..(Stark, Corey) (Entered: 09/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Bradley Robinson waiver sent on 8/21/2023, answer due 10/20/2023. Document filed by Jason Leeds..(Stark, Corey) (Entered: 09/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Max Crespo waiver sent on 8/21/2023, answer due 10/20/2023. Document filed by Jason Leeds..(Stark, Corey) (Entered: 09/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. EVFoods, LLC waiver sent on 8/21/2023, answer due 10/20/2023. Document filed by Jason Leeds..(Stark, Corey) (Entered: 09/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to ADP Totalsource Co. XXI Inc, Max Crespo, EVFoods, LLC, Bradley Robinson. (vf) (Entered: 08/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023

DocketCase Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 08/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023

DocketMagistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf) (Entered: 08/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023

DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf) (Entered: 08/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023

Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Corey Scott Stark. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (vf) (Entered: 08/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023

Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Corey Scott Stark. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: ADP TOTALSOURCE CO. XXI INC; EVFOODS, LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (vf) (Entered: 08/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Stark, Corey) (Entered: 08/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to EVFOODS, LLC, ADP TOTALSOURCE CO. XXI INC., MAX CRESPO, and BRADLEY ROBINSON, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jason Leeds..(Stark, Corey) (Entered: 08/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ADP TOTALSOURCE CO. XXI INC., Max Crespo, EVFOODS, LLC,, Bradley Robinson. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28147633)Document filed by Jason Leeds..(Stark, Corey) (Entered: 08/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less