This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/01/2023 at 08:20:25 (UTC).

McIntosh v. Walmart Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/02/2023 McIntosh filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Walmart Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nebraska District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Cheryl R. Zwart. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:23-CV-03103

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cheryl R. Zwart

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anthony McIntosh

Defendants

American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania

Walmart Inc. doing business as Walmart Lexington Supercenter

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James J. Paloucek

Defendant Attorneys

Jessica R. Voelker

Mark J. Goldsmith

Cameron C. Finke

George E. Martin, III

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against Anthony McIntosh from District Court of Dawson County, Nebraska, Case number CI 23-145 ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4876199) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Mark J. Goldsmith on behalf of Walmart Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Removal, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of MJG, #4 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of MJG, #5 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of MJG)(Goldsmith, Mark) (Entered: 06/02/2023)

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings

1 #2

Exhibit B - State Court Removal

1 #3

Exhibit C - Declaration of MJG

1 #4

Exhibit 1 - Declaration of MJG

1 #5

Exhibit 2 - Declaration of MJG

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Jessica R. Voelker has not registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (NMW) (Entered: 06/05/2023)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint,, #1 by Walmart Inc. (Goldsmith, Mark) (Entered: 06/08/2023)

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Mark J. Goldsmith on behalf of Defendant Walmart Inc..(Goldsmith, Mark) (Entered: 06/08/2023)

#7

(#7) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Mark J. Goldsmith on behalf of Defendant Walmart Inc..(Goldsmith, Mark) (Entered: 07/11/2023)

#8

(#8) Defendant's ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint,, #1 Amended Complaint by American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania (Voelker, Jessica) (Entered: 07/12/2023)

#10

(#10) FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - Depositions due 2/29/2024. The trial and pretrial conference will not be set at this time. A status conference to discuss case progression, the parties' interest in settlement, and the trial and pretrial conference settings will be held with the undersigned magistrate judge on March 5, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. by telephone. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JES) (Entered: 07/13/2023)

#11

(#11) PROTECTIVE ORDER - Upon consideration of the parties' joint request for entry of a Protective Order, (Filing No. #7 ), the Court enters the following Protective Order governing the disclosure of confidential Discovery Material by a Producing Party to a Receiving Party in this Action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JES) (Entered: 07/13/2023)

#12

RESTRICTED

#13

(#13) Certificate of Service by Attorney James J. Paloucek on behalf of Plaintiff Anthony McIntosh.(Paloucek, James) (Entered: 07/21/2023)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Service of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures by Attorney Mark J. Goldsmith on behalf of Defendant Walmart Inc. (Goldsmith, Mark) (Entered: 07/21/2023)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Cameron C. Finke on behalf of Defendant Walmart Inc. (Finke, Cameron) (Entered: 07/21/2023)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Cameron C. Finke on behalf of Defendant Walmart Inc. (Finke, Cameron) (Entered: 07/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) NOTICE of Service of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures by Attorney Mark J. Goldsmith on behalf of Defendant Walmart Inc. (Goldsmith, Mark) (Entered: 07/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) Certificate of Service by Attorney James J. Paloucek on behalf of Plaintiff Anthony McIntosh.(Paloucek, James) (Entered: 07/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) RESTRICTED CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JES) (Entered: 07/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) PROTECTIVE ORDER - Upon consideration of the parties' joint request for entry of a Protective Order, (Filing No. #7 ), the Court enters the following Protective Order governing the disclosure of confidential Discovery Material by a Producing Party to a Receiving Party in this Action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JES) (Entered: 07/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - Depositions due 2/29/2024. The trial and pretrial conference will not be set at this time. A status conference to discuss case progression, the parties' interest in settlement, and the trial and pretrial conference settings will be held with the undersigned magistrate judge on March 5, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. by telephone. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JES) (Entered: 07/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023

Docket(#9) TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(JAB) (Entered: 07/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Defendant's ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint,, #1 Amended Complaint by American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania (Voelker, Jessica) (Entered: 07/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Mark J. Goldsmith on behalf of Defendant Walmart Inc..(Goldsmith, Mark) (Entered: 07/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Mark J. Goldsmith on behalf of Defendant Walmart Inc..(Goldsmith, Mark) (Entered: 06/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint,, #1 by Walmart Inc. (Goldsmith, Mark) (Entered: 06/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Jessica R. Voelker has not registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (NMW) (Entered: 06/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023

Docket(#3) TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Walmart Inc.. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(NMW) (Entered: 06/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023

Docket(#2) TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (NMW) (Entered: 06/05/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against Anthony McIntosh from District Court of Dawson County, Nebraska, Case number CI 23-145 ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4876199) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Mark J. Goldsmith on behalf of Walmart Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Removal, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of MJG, #4 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of MJG, #5 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of MJG)(Goldsmith, Mark) (Entered: 06/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less