This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/18/2023 at 08:08:32 (UTC).

Grant et al v. Abbott Laboratories, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/19/2023 Grant filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Abbott Laboratories, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is David S Morales. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00133

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David S Morales

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jason Grant

Madison Brousseau

Defendant

Abbott Laboratories, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rudy Gonzales, Jr

Catherine Danielle Tobin

Leslie Tyroch

Robert C. Hilliard

Defendant Attorney

Robert Edward Booth

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County Court at Law No. 2 of Nieces County, Texas, case number 2023CCV-60609-2 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-29948187) filed by Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit Pleadings, #3 Exhibit List of All Counsel, #4 Exhibit Index of Matters)(Booth, Robert) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

1 #1

Exhibit Docket Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit Pleadings

1 #3

Exhibit List of All Counsel

1 #4

Exhibit Index of Matters

#2

(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/9/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge David S Morales. Parties notified.(SashaOzuna, 2) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

#3

(#3) JPML CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-9) transferring case to Northern District of Illinois to be included in MDL Docket No. 3037. (LisaTien, 4) (Entered: 06/06/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2023
  • DocketRECEIPT of Transfer Letter re: transfer of case to Northern District of Illinois. New Case # assigned: 1:23-cv-03421 and received on 6/8/2023., filed. (Notified by email) (MarcelleLaBee, 4) (Entered: 06/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketInterdistrict transfer to Northern District of Illinois. Case transferred electronically. (LisaTien, 4) (Entered: 06/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) JPML CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-9) transferring case to Northern District of Illinois to be included in MDL Docket No. 3037. (LisaTien, 4) (Entered: 06/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/9/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge David S Morales. Parties notified.(SashaOzuna, 2) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County Court at Law No. 2 of Nieces County, Texas, case number 2023CCV-60609-2 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-29948187) filed by Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit Pleadings, #3 Exhibit List of All Counsel, #4 Exhibit Index of Matters)(Booth, Robert) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less