This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/31/2023 at 07:38:22 (UTC).

Sauceda v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 06/01/2023 Sauceda filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Katherine M. Menendez and David T. Schultz. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:23-CV-01632

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Katherine M. Menendez

Referral Judge

David T. Schultz

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jenaiah Sauceda

Defendant

Metropolitan Life Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Zachary Schmoll

Blake R Bauer

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel Keenan Ryan

Margaret Ann Santos

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-10316325) filed by Jenaiah Sauceda. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Exhibit B) (Bauer, Blake) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

1 #1

Exhibit(s) Exhibit A

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Exhibit B

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (ACH) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Ann Santos on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Santos, Margaret) (Entered: 06/26/2023)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel K. Ryan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10373044 filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Santos, Margaret) (Entered: 06/26/2023)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company waiver sent on 6/7/2023, answer due 8/7/2023. (Santos, Margaret) (Entered: 06/26/2023)

#7

(#7) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or subsidiary reported for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Santos, Margaret) (Entered: 06/26/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) (Text-Only) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Daniel Keenan Ryan for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Approved by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 6/27/2023. (jam) (Entered: 06/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or subsidiary reported for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Santos, Margaret) (Entered: 06/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company waiver sent on 6/7/2023, answer due 8/7/2023. (Santos, Margaret) (Entered: 06/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel K. Ryan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10373044 filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Santos, Margaret) (Entered: 06/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Ann Santos on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Santos, Margaret) (Entered: 06/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (ACH) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • Docket(#2) (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Katherine M. Menendez per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 23-cv-1632 KMM/DTS.Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ACH) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-10316325) filed by Jenaiah Sauceda. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Exhibit B) (Bauer, Blake) (Entered: 06/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less