4:23-CV-00254
09/12/2023
Pending - Other Pending
Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
R. Stan Baker
Christopher L. Ray
Jessica Paschall
Cornell Hopkins
Beemac, Inc. doing business as Beemac Trucking
Arch Insurance Company
Cecil Clay Davis
Mary Kathleen Hashemi
Donavan K. Eason
Blair Joseph Cash
(#25) NOTICE that discovery is not filed with the Court re 22 Certificate of Service of Defendant's Initial Disclosures. (thb) (Entered: 11/08/2023)
RESTRICTED
(#21) ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave of Absence for attorney Mary Hashemi for the dates of Wednesday, December 20, 2023 through Tuesday, December, 26, 2023 for family vacation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 11/7/23. (wwp) (Entered: 11/08/2023)
(#20) ORDER granting re #18 Motion for Leave of Absence for the dates of Tuesday, December 26, 2023 through Wednesday, January, 3, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 11/7/23. (loh) (Entered: 11/08/2023)
(#19) NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #18 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Jessica Paschall for dates of : Dec. 26, 2023 through Jan. 3, 2024. (thb) (Entered: 11/07/2023)
(#18) MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Jessica Paschall for dates of : Dec. 26, 2023 through Jan. 3, 2024 by Jessica Paschall. Responses due by 11/21/2023. (Hashemi, Mary) (Entered: 11/07/2023)
(#17) MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Jessica Paschall for dates of : Dec. 20, 2023 through Dec. 26, 2023 by Jessica Paschall. Responses due by 11/21/2023. (Hashemi, Mary) (Entered: 11/07/2023)
(#16) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 12/4/2023. Discovery due by 1/16/2024. Motions due by 5/10/2024. Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 3/12/2024. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 3/12/2024. Status Report due by 4/25/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 10/31/23. (loh) (Entered: 10/31/2023)
(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Blair Joseph Cash on behalf of All Defendants (Cash, Blair) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/30/2023: #1 Main Document (Correct PDF)) (thb). (Entered: 10/30/2023)
(#8) ANSWER to Complaint by Beemac, Inc..(Eason, Donavan) (Entered: 10/04/2023)
(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by Arch Insurance Company.(Eason, Donavan) (Entered: 10/04/2023)
Corrected Summons
(#6) Summons Issued as to Arch Insurance Company, Beemac, Inc., Cornell Hopkins. (ca) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/12/2023: #1 Corrected Summons) (ca). (Entered: 09/12/2023)
(#4) RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 9/12/2023. (ca) (Entered: 09/12/2023)
(#3) Litigants' Bill of Rights by Jessica Paschall. (ca) (Entered: 09/12/2023)
(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jessica Paschall. (ca) (Entered: 09/12/2023)
Civil Cover Sheet
(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jessica Paschall. (Fee paid: Receipt # AGASDC-3659847, $402) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ca) (Entered: 09/12/2023)
Docket(#25) NOTICE that discovery is not filed with the Court re 22 Certificate of Service of Defendant's Initial Disclosures. (thb) (Entered: 11/08/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#24) NOTICE that discovery is not filed with the Court re 23 Certificate of Service of First Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff. (thb) (Entered: 11/08/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#21) ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave of Absence for attorney Mary Hashemi for the dates of Wednesday, December 20, 2023 through Tuesday, December, 26, 2023 for family vacation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 11/7/23. (wwp) (Entered: 11/08/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#20) ORDER granting re #18 Motion for Leave of Absence for the dates of Tuesday, December 26, 2023 through Wednesday, January, 3, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 11/7/23. (loh) (Entered: 11/08/2023)
[-] Read LessDocketMOTIONS REFERRED: #18 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Jessica Paschall for dates of : Dec. 26, 2023 through Jan. 3, 2024, #17 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Jessica Paschall for dates of : Dec. 20, 2023 through Dec. 26, 2023 (thb) (Entered: 11/07/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#19) NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #18 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Jessica Paschall for dates of : Dec. 26, 2023 through Jan. 3, 2024. (thb) (Entered: 11/07/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#18) MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Jessica Paschall for dates of : Dec. 26, 2023 through Jan. 3, 2024 by Jessica Paschall. Responses due by 11/21/2023. (Hashemi, Mary) (Entered: 11/07/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#17) MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Jessica Paschall for dates of : Dec. 20, 2023 through Dec. 26, 2023 by Jessica Paschall. Responses due by 11/21/2023. (Hashemi, Mary) (Entered: 11/07/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#16) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 12/4/2023. Discovery due by 1/16/2024. Motions due by 5/10/2024. Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 3/12/2024. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 3/12/2024. Status Report due by 4/25/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 10/31/23. (loh) (Entered: 10/31/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Blair Joseph Cash on behalf of All Defendants (Cash, Blair) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/30/2023: #1 Main Document (Correct PDF)) (thb). (Entered: 10/30/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#10) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Arch Insurance Company, Beemac, Inc., Cornell Hopkins. (Eason, Donavan) (Entered: 10/04/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint by Cornell Hopkins.(Eason, Donavan) (Entered: 10/04/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint by Beemac, Inc..(Eason, Donavan) (Entered: 10/04/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by Arch Insurance Company.(Eason, Donavan) (Entered: 10/04/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#6) Summons Issued as to Arch Insurance Company, Beemac, Inc., Cornell Hopkins. (ca) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/12/2023: #1 Corrected Summons) (ca). (Entered: 09/12/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (ca) (Entered: 09/12/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 9/12/2023. (ca) (Entered: 09/12/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) Litigants' Bill of Rights by Jessica Paschall. (ca) (Entered: 09/12/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jessica Paschall. (ca) (Entered: 09/12/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jessica Paschall. (Fee paid: Receipt # AGASDC-3659847, $402) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ca) (Entered: 09/12/2023)
[-] Read Less