This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/11/2023 at 09:38:58 (UTC).

Lewis v. State Farm et al

Case Summary

On 09/12/2023 Lewis filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability lawsuit against State Farm. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-08089

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Regina Lewis

Defendants

State Farm

John W. Owens

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) MOTION re: for permission to file a Complaint. Document filed by Regina Lewis. (sac) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against John W. Owens, State Farm. Document filed by Regina Lewis. (sac) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

#3

(#3) REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Regina Lewis. (sac) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

#4

(#4) PRO SE MEMORANDUM,dated 9/18/23 re: CHANGE OF ADDRESS for Regina Lewis. New Address: 135 Main Street, Apt. 801, Poughkeepsie, NY, 12601. (sc) (Entered: 09/26/2023)

 

Docket Entries

09/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) PRO SE MEMORANDUM,dated 9/18/23 re: CHANGE OF ADDRESS for Regina Lewis. New Address: 135 Main Street, Apt. 801, Poughkeepsie, NY, 12601. (sc) (Entered: 09/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023

DocketCase Designated ECF. (sac) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Regina Lewis. (sac) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against John W. Owens, State Farm. Document filed by Regina Lewis. (sac) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) MOTION re: for permission to file a Complaint. Document filed by Regina Lewis. (sac) (Entered: 09/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less