This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/19/2023 at 07:53:34 (UTC).

Famuyide v. Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/20/2023 Famuyide filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Donovan W. Frank and Elizabeth Cowan Wright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:23-CV-01127

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donovan W. Frank

Referral Judge

Elizabeth Cowan Wright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eniola Famuyide

Defendants

Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.

Chipotle Services, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Melissa Hodge

Pamela Abbate-Dattilo

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew D. Treco

Carli D Pearson

Elizabeth Bulat Turner

Tina Syring-Petrocchi

 

Court Documents

26 #1

Exhibit(s) A - E

#26

(#26) DECLARATION of Pamela Abbate-Dattilo in Opposition to #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss or, In the Alternative, Stay These Proceedings Pending Arbitration MOTION to Dismiss/General MOTION to Stay filed by Eniola Famuyide. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - E)(Abbate-Dattilo, Pamela) (Entered: 06/12/2023)

#25

(#25) DECLARATION of Eniola Famuyide in Opposition to #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss or, In the Alternative, Stay These Proceedings Pending Arbitration MOTION to Dismiss/General MOTION to Stay filed by Eniola Famuyide.(Abbate-Dattilo, Pamela) (Entered: 06/12/2023)

24 #1

LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate

#24

(#24) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss or, In the Alternative, Stay These Proceedings Pending Arbitration MOTION to Dismiss/General MOTION to Stay filed by Eniola Famuyide. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Abbate-Dattilo, Pamela) (Entered: 06/12/2023)

#22

(#22) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #21 Stipulation. (Abbate-Dattilo, Pamela) (Entered: 06/05/2023)

#21

(#21) STIPULATION to Modify Briefing Schedule by Eniola Famuyide. Jointly Signed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. and Chipotle Services, LLC. (Abbate-Dattilo, Pamela) (Entered: 06/05/2023)

#17

(#17) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Betsy Bulat. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10302084 filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc., Chipotle Services, LLC. (Pearson, Carli) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

9 #1

LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate

#9

(#9) MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss or, In the Alternative, Stay These Proceedings Pending Arbitration filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc., Chipotle Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Pearson, Carli) (Entered: 05/15/2023)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss or, In the Alternative, Stay These Proceedings Pending Arbitration : Motion Hearing set for 7/7/2023 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7C (STP) before Judge Donovan W. Frank. (Pearson, Carli) (Entered: 05/15/2023)

#7

(#20) (Text-Only) AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: The hearing regarding #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss or, In the Alternative, Stay These Proceedings Pending Arbitration MOTION to Dismiss/General MOTION to Stay has been rescheduled. The Motion Hearing IS NOW set for 7/20/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7C (STP) before Judge Donovan W. Frank. (las) (Entered: 06/02/2023)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Carli D Pearson on behalf of Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc., Chipotle Services, LLC. (Pearson, Carli) (Entered: 05/15/2023)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eniola Famuyide. Chipotle Services, LLC served on 4/24/23, answer due 5/15/2023. (Abbate-Dattilo, Pamela) Modified text on 5/2/2023 (ABR). (Entered: 05/01/2023)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eniola Famuyide. Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. served on 4/24/23, answer due 5/15/2023. (Abbate-Dattilo, Pamela) Modified text on 5/2/2023 (ABR). (Entered: 05/01/2023)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc., Chipotle Services, LLC. (ACH) (Entered: 04/20/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc., Chipotle Services, LLC (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-10217755) filed by Eniola Famuyide. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Abbate-Dattilo, Pamela) (Entered: 04/20/2023)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) DECLARATION of Pamela Abbate-Dattilo in Opposition to #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss or, In the Alternative, Stay These Proceedings Pending Arbitration MOTION to Dismiss/General MOTION to Stay filed by Eniola Famuyide. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - E)(Abbate-Dattilo, Pamela) (Entered: 06/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) DECLARATION of Eniola Famuyide in Opposition to #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss or, In the Alternative, Stay These Proceedings Pending Arbitration MOTION to Dismiss/General MOTION to Stay filed by Eniola Famuyide.(Abbate-Dattilo, Pamela) (Entered: 06/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss or, In the Alternative, Stay These Proceedings Pending Arbitration MOTION to Dismiss/General MOTION to Stay filed by Eniola Famuyide. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Abbate-Dattilo, Pamela) (Entered: 06/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) TEXT ONLY ORDER: The parties' Stipulation for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to respond to Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. and Chipotle Services, LLC's, Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss or, in the Alternative Stay these Proceedings Pending Arbitration (Doc. No. #21 ) is APPROVED. Plaintiff shall have up to and including June 12, 2023, to Respond to the Motion to Compel/Dismiss. Defendant has fourteen (14) days therefrom, up to and including June 26, 2022, to submit its Reply Memorandum. Ordered by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 6/6/2023.(las) (Entered: 06/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #21 Stipulation. (Abbate-Dattilo, Pamela) (Entered: 06/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) STIPULATION to Modify Briefing Schedule by Eniola Famuyide. Jointly Signed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. and Chipotle Services, LLC. (Abbate-Dattilo, Pamela) (Entered: 06/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) (Text-Only) AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: The hearing regarding #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss or, In the Alternative, Stay These Proceedings Pending Arbitration MOTION to Dismiss/General MOTION to Stay has been rescheduled. The Motion Hearing IS NOW set for 7/20/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7C (STP) before Judge Donovan W. Frank. (las) (Entered: 06/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) (Text-Only) ORDER granting #17 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Elizabeth Bulat Turner (Betsy Bulat) for Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. and Chipotle Services, LLC.; granting #18 Motion for Admission Matthew D. Treco for Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. and Chipotle Services, LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 6/2/2023. (jam) (Entered: 06/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Matthew D. Treco. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10302117 filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc., Chipotle Services, LLC. (Pearson, Carli) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Betsy Bulat. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10302084 filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc., Chipotle Services, LLC. (Pearson, Carli) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Declaration of Tammy Simpson in Support of #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss or, In the Alternative, Stay These Proceedings Pending Arbitration filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc., Chipotle Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-4)(Pearson, Carli) (Entered: 05/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss or, In the Alternative, Stay These Proceedings Pending Arbitration filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc., Chipotle Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Pearson, Carli) (Entered: 05/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss or, In the Alternative, Stay These Proceedings Pending Arbitration : Motion Hearing set for 7/7/2023 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7C (STP) before Judge Donovan W. Frank. (Pearson, Carli) (Entered: 05/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Compel Arbitration, MOTION to Dismiss/General, MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc., Chipotle Services, LLC. (Pearson, Carli). Added MOTION to Dismiss/General, MOTION to Stay on 5/16/2023 (ABR). (Entered: 05/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Carli D Pearson on behalf of Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc., Chipotle Services, LLC. (Pearson, Carli) (Entered: 05/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eniola Famuyide. Chipotle Services, LLC served on 4/24/23, answer due 5/15/2023. (Abbate-Dattilo, Pamela) Modified text on 5/2/2023 (ABR). (Entered: 05/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eniola Famuyide. Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. served on 4/24/23, answer due 5/15/2023. (Abbate-Dattilo, Pamela) Modified text on 5/2/2023 (ABR). (Entered: 05/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc., Chipotle Services, LLC. (ACH) (Entered: 04/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • Docket(#2) (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per Civil (3rd, 4th - Civil Rights) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 23-cv-1127 DWF/ECW.Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ACH) (Entered: 04/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc., Chipotle Services, LLC (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-10217755) filed by Eniola Famuyide. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Abbate-Dattilo, Pamela) (Entered: 04/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less