This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/16/2023 at 08:17:09 (UTC).

Berry-Baptiste et al v. Abbott Laboratories Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/17/2023 Berry-Baptiste filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Abbott Laboratories Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-02352

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rebecca R. Pallmeyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sheerah Berry-Baptiste

Donald Baptiste

Defendants

Abbott Laboratories Inc

Mead Johnson & Company LLC

Mead Johnson Nutrition Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Marjorie H Levine

Defendant Attorneys

Meir Feder

Bridget Kathleen O'Connor

Rachel Marie Cannon

Elyse Debra Echtman

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Mead Johnson & Company LLC, Mead Johnson Nutrition Company by Elyse Debra Echtman (Echtman, Elyse) (Entered: 05/30/2023)

#20

(#20) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Mead Johnson & Company LLC, Mead Johnson Nutrition Company by Rachel Marie Cannon (Cannon, Rachel) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

#19

(#19) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Abbott Laboratories Inc by Meir Feder (Feder, Meir) (Entered: 05/03/2023)

#18

(#18) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Abbott Laboratories Inc by Bridget Kathleen O'Connor (O'Connor, Bridget) (Entered: 05/03/2023)

#17

(#17) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Sheerah Berry-Baptiste, Donald Baptiste. Mead Johnson Nutrition Company waiver sent on 3/22/2023, answer due 5/22/2023. (Levine, Marjorie) (Entered: 04/18/2023)

#16

(#16) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Sheerah Berry-Baptiste, Donald Baptiste. Mead Johnson & Company LLC waiver sent on 3/22/2023, answer due 5/22/2023. (Levine, Marjorie) (Entered: 04/18/2023)

#15

(#15) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Sheerah Berry-Baptiste, Donald Baptiste. Abbott Laboratories Inc waiver sent on 3/22/2023, answer due 5/22/2023. (Levine, Marjorie) (Entered: 04/18/2023)

14 #1

*Restricted*

#14

(#14) RECEIVED from Florida Southern; Case Number 0:23-cv-60529 (gcy) (Entered: 04/17/2023)

#9

(#9) Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates by DONALD BERRY, Sheerah Berry-Baptiste identifying Other Affiliate John F Romano, Other Affiliate Levin, Rojas, Camassar & Reck, LLC for DONALD BERRY, Sheerah Berry-Baptiste (Levine, Marjorie) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/17/2023.] (Entered: 03/24/2023)

#8

(#10) CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has not updated address and/or email information for attorney Marjorie H Levine re #8 Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name. Attorney Marjorie H Levine has not completed the required procedures for updating their information with the Court. After filing something in any pending cases, Attorney is instructed to go to their PACER account, Manage My Account, to complete the process of updating their information. The Court is NOT responsible for updating secondary email addresses. See the Courts website for detailed instructions. #www.flsd.uscourts.gov/updating-your-information (pt) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/17/2023.] (Entered: 03/24/2023)

#7

(#7) Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, by DONALD BERRY, Sheerah Berry-Baptiste. Responses due by 4/5/2023 (Levine, Marjorie) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/17/2023.] (Entered: 03/22/2023)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Abbott Laboratories Inc., Mead Johnson & Company, LLC, Mead Johnson Nutrition Company. (nwn) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/17/2023.] (Entered: 03/21/2023)

1 #4

Summon(s)

1 #3

Summon(s)

1 #2

Summon(s)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#7) Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, by DONALD BERRY, Sheerah Berry-Baptiste. Responses due by 4/5/2023 (Levine, Marjorie) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/17/2023.] (Entered: 03/22/2023)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#21) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Mead Johnson & Company LLC, Mead Johnson Nutrition Company by Elyse Debra Echtman (Echtman, Elyse) (Entered: 05/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#20) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Mead Johnson & Company LLC, Mead Johnson Nutrition Company by Rachel Marie Cannon (Cannon, Rachel) (Entered: 05/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#19) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Abbott Laboratories Inc by Meir Feder (Feder, Meir) (Entered: 05/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Abbott Laboratories Inc by Bridget Kathleen O'Connor (O'Connor, Bridget) (Entered: 05/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Sheerah Berry-Baptiste, Donald Baptiste. Mead Johnson Nutrition Company waiver sent on 3/22/2023, answer due 5/22/2023. (Levine, Marjorie) (Entered: 04/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Sheerah Berry-Baptiste, Donald Baptiste. Mead Johnson & Company LLC waiver sent on 3/22/2023, answer due 5/22/2023. (Levine, Marjorie) (Entered: 04/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Sheerah Berry-Baptiste, Donald Baptiste. Abbott Laboratories Inc waiver sent on 3/22/2023, answer due 5/22/2023. (Levine, Marjorie) (Entered: 04/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) RECEIVED from Florida Southern; Case Number 0:23-cv-60529 (gcy) (Entered: 04/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-38) transferring case to the Northern District of Illinois re: MDL 3026 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. (Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel). (pes) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/17/2023.] (Entered: 04/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) NOTICE of Compliance ( Case Style Updated to Reflect Plaintiff's Correct Name (Donald Baptiste). re #11 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct (cds) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/17/2023.] (Entered: 03/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
03/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has not updated address and/or email information for attorney Marjorie H Levine re #8 Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name. Attorney Marjorie H Levine has not completed the required procedures for updating their information with the Court. After filing something in any pending cases, Attorney is instructed to go to their PACER account, Manage My Account, to complete the process of updating their information. The Court is NOT responsible for updating secondary email addresses. See the Courts website for detailed instructions. #www.flsd.uscourts.gov/updating-your-information (pt) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/17/2023.] (Entered: 03/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates by DONALD BERRY, Sheerah Berry-Baptiste identifying Other Affiliate John F Romano, Other Affiliate Levin, Rojas, Camassar & Reck, LLC for DONALD BERRY, Sheerah Berry-Baptiste (Levine, Marjorie) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/17/2023.] (Entered: 03/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Marjorie H Levine (Levine, Marjorie) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/17/2023.] (Entered: 03/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, by DONALD BERRY, Sheerah Berry-Baptiste. Responses due by 4/5/2023 (Levine, Marjorie) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/17/2023.] (Entered: 03/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2023

Docket(#6) PAPERLESS ORDER TO FILE CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONSWithin SEVEN (7) DAYS of entry of an appearance, each party, including governmental parties, must file certificates of interested parties and corporate disclosure statements that contain a complete list of persons, associated persons, firms, partnerships, or corporations that have a financial interest in the outcome of this case, including subsidiaries, conglomerates, affiliates, parent corporations, and other identifiable legal entities related to a party. The parties shall not include Judge Singhal or the paired magistrate judges as interested parties unless they have an interest in the litigation. Throughout the pendency of the action, the parties are under a continuing obligation to amend, correct, and update the certificates. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 3/21/2023. (am00) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/17/2023.] (Entered: 03/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2023

Docket(#5) NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICEUnless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall: be double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c). The Court cautions parties against excessive use of footnotes.Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions (and responses to motions) with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions (and responses).Parties are encouraged to seek extensions of time in a timely fashion. "A motion for extension of time is not self-executing; no motion is, unless expressly provided for by the applicable rule. Yet, by filing these motions on or near the last day, and then sitting idle pending the Court's disposition of the motion, parties essentially grant their own motion. The Court will not condone this." Compere v. Nusret Miami, LLC, 2020 WL 2844888, at *2 (S.D. Fla. May 7, 2020) (internal citations omitted).Exhibits to pleadings and motions shall be docketed in accordance with the Courts CM/ECF procedures, Rule 3L.(2): (2) Describing an Attachment to a Docket EntryA party filing an attachment to a document shall select one of the prescribed attachment categories from the drop-down menu (e.g., affidavit, transcript), provide an alphabetical or numerical designation (e.g., Exhibit A, Exhibit 1), and descriptively name each attachment (e.g., Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Boo Radley) in a manner that enables the Court to easily locate and distinguish attachments. (Emphasis added.) Local Rule 16.4, Local Rules for the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, requires that a Notice of Settlement "shall be filed and served jointly by counsel for all parties to the settlement." A unilateral notice of settlement will not stay pre-trial deadlines or hearings.Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 3/21/2023. (am00) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/17/2023.] (Entered: 03/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2023

Docket(#4) Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. The Clerks Office confirmed Broward (Office - Ft Lauderdale) as the county with the filer. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (nwn) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/17/2023.] (Entered: 03/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Abbott Laboratories Inc., Mead Johnson & Company, LLC, Mead Johnson Nutrition Company. (nwn) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/17/2023.] (Entered: 03/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023

Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nwn) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/17/2023.] (Entered: 03/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Abbott Laboratories Inc., Mead Johnson & Company, LLC, Mead Johnson Nutrition Company. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16447448, filed by Sheerah Berry-Baptiste, Donald Baptiste. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s))(Levine, Marjorie) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 4/17/2023.] (Entered: 03/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less