This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/16/2023 at 07:59:27 (UTC).

Barnes et al v. RMS Protective Services et al

Case Summary

On 03/17/2023 Barnes filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against RMS Protective Services. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Nicholas A Danella. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00342

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nicholas A Danella

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ronald G. Barnes

Gerald Behan

Michael Donald

Pat Evans

Cody Hastings

Scott Key

Jacob Lloyd

Jared Weaver

Michael Michalak

Kevin Chung

Adrian Carrancejie

Shawn Roberts

Defendants

RMS Protective Services

Mithras Protective Services, Inc.

Lyndon Brentnall

Rivas Solutions, LLC

Allied Universal Compliance and Investigations, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John R Jacobs

Paisley Anne Newsome

Joseph T Walker

Defendant Attorneys

Danielle Elysees Douglas

Drew K. Patterson

Todd David Engelhardt

Anna Wren Broadaway

Andrew L. Edge

Julie Hunter-Anderson

Kelly Eisenlohr-Moul

 

Court Documents

#40

(#40) ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by no later than June 27, 2023. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a randomly drawn district judge without further order after June 27, 2023. A Telephone Status Conference is hereby SET for 10:30 AM on Thursday, June 1, 2023. The parties are DIRECTED to call 888-363-4735 access code 6785641 five minutes prior to the start time of the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas A Danella on 5/11/2023. (JLC) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

#39

(#39) ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26, reminding the parties of their obligations under FRCP 26(f). Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/15/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas A Danella on 5/11/2023. (JLC) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

#38

(#38) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Rivas Solutions, LLC.(Broadaway, Anna) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

29 #5

Exhibit Exhibit B Part 3

29 #3

Exhibit Exhibit B Part 1

29 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A

29 #1

Exhibit Table of Contents

#29

(#36) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #28 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO RULE 12(b)(6) AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW, #29 MOTION to Dismiss by Ronald G. Barnes, Gerald Behan, Adrian Carrancejie, Kevin Chung, Michael Donald, Pat Evans, Cody Hastings, Scott Key, Jacob Lloyd, Michael Michalak. (Jacobs, John) (Entered: 05/09/2023)

#28

(#36) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #28 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO RULE 12(b)(6) AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW, #29 MOTION to Dismiss by Ronald G. Barnes, Gerald Behan, Adrian Carrancejie, Kevin Chung, Michael Donald, Pat Evans, Cody Hastings, Scott Key, Jacob Lloyd, Michael Michalak. (Jacobs, John) (Entered: 05/09/2023)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shawn Roberts, Adrian Carrancejie, Cody Hastings, Ronald G. Barnes, Scott Key, Michael Michalak, Jacob Lloyd, Jared Weaver, Michael Donald, Pat Evans, Gerald Behan, Kevin Chung. Lyndon Brentnall served on 3/27/2023, answer due 4/17/2023; RMS Protective Services served on 3/27/2023, answer due 4/17/2023. (JLC) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew L. Edge on behalf of Allied Universal Compliance and Investigations, Inc. (Edge, Andrew) (Entered: 03/29/2023)

#5

(#5) First MOTION for Joinder Robert Krott's Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by Ronald G. Barnes. (Jacobs, John) (Entered: 03/28/2023)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Allied Universal Compliance and Investigations, Inc., Lyndon Brentnall, Mithras Protective Services, Inc., RMS Protective Services and Rivas Solutions, LLC, via certified U.S. Mail on this the 22nd day of March, 2023. (JLC) (Entered: 03/22/2023)

#3

(#3) Request for service by certified mail filed by Ronald G. Barnes, Gerald Behan, Adrian Carrancejie, Kevin Chung, Michael Donald, Pat Evans, Cody Hastings, Scott Key, Jacob Lloyd, Michael Michalak, Shawn Roberts, Jared Weaver. (Jacobs, John) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF A CASE TO A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR TRIAL. (JLC) (Entered: 03/17/2023)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#38) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Rivas Solutions, LLC.(Broadaway, Anna) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by no later than June 27, 2023. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a randomly drawn district judge without further order after June 27, 2023. A Telephone Status Conference is hereby SET for 10:30 AM on Thursday, June 1, 2023. The parties are DIRECTED to call 888-363-4735 access code 6785641 five minutes prior to the start time of the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas A Danella on 5/11/2023. (JLC) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26, reminding the parties of their obligations under FRCP 26(f). Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/15/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas A Danella on 5/11/2023. (JLC) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Rivas Solutions, LLC.(Broadaway, Anna) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReset Deadlines as to #28 #29 MOTIONS to Dismiss. Responses due on or before May 29, 2023. Replies due on or before June 5, 2023. (JLC) (Entered: 05/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) TEXT ORDER: Plaintiffs' "Consent Motion For Extension Of Time" (Doc. #36 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall respond to the pending motions to dismiss (Doc. #28 ; Doc. #29 ) on or before May 29, 2023. Any reply shall be filed on or before June 5, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas A Danella on 5/10/2023. (JLC) (Entered: 05/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #28 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO RULE 12(b)(6) AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW, #29 MOTION to Dismiss by Ronald G. Barnes, Gerald Behan, Adrian Carrancejie, Kevin Chung, Michael Donald, Pat Evans, Cody Hastings, Scott Key, Jacob Lloyd, Michael Michalak. (Jacobs, John) (Entered: 05/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) MOTION for Joinder Jonathan Noboa's Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by Ronald G. Barnes. (Jacobs, John) (Entered: 05/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) TEXT ORDER GRANTING Motion For Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Drew K. Patterson. Doc. #33 . Attorney Drew K. Patterson for RMS Protective Services added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas A Danella on 5/5/2023. (JLC) (Entered: 05/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketPHV Fee paid for Drew K. Patterson in the amount of $75.00, Credit Card receipt number AALNDC-4335871, NDAL receipt #B5132. (Engelhardt, Todd) Modified on 5/5/2023 (JLC). (Entered: 05/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Drew K. Patterson by Lyndon Brentnall, Mithras Protective Services, Inc., RMS Protective Services. (Engelhardt, Todd) (Entered: 05/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 03/31/2023
  • DocketPHV Fee paid for Kelly Eisenlohr-Moul in the amount of $75.00, Credit Card receipt number AALNDC-4307930, NDAL receipt #B4523. (Edge, Andrew) Modified on 3/31/2023 (JLC). (Entered: 03/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Allied Universal Compliance and Investigations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Edge, Andrew) (Entered: 03/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shawn Roberts, Adrian Carrancejie, Cody Hastings, Ronald G. Barnes, Scott Key, Michael Michalak, Jacob Lloyd, Jared Weaver, Michael Donald, Pat Evans, Gerald Behan, Kevin Chung. Lyndon Brentnall served on 3/27/2023, answer due 4/17/2023; RMS Protective Services served on 3/27/2023, answer due 4/17/2023. (JLC) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew L. Edge on behalf of Allied Universal Compliance and Investigations, Inc. (Edge, Andrew) (Entered: 03/29/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) First MOTION for Joinder Robert Krott's Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by Ronald G. Barnes. (Jacobs, John) (Entered: 03/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Allied Universal Compliance and Investigations, Inc., Lyndon Brentnall, Mithras Protective Services, Inc., RMS Protective Services and Rivas Solutions, LLC, via certified U.S. Mail on this the 22nd day of March, 2023. (JLC) (Entered: 03/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketFiling Fee received in the amount of $402.00, Credit Card receipt_number AALNDC-4298679, NDAL receipt #B4378. (Jacobs, John) Modified on 3/21/2023 (JLC). (Entered: 03/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for service by certified mail filed by Ronald G. Barnes, Gerald Behan, Adrian Carrancejie, Kevin Chung, Michael Donald, Pat Evans, Cody Hastings, Scott Key, Jacob Lloyd, Michael Michalak, Shawn Roberts, Jared Weaver. (Jacobs, John) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF A CASE TO A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR TRIAL. (JLC) (Entered: 03/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Michael Donald, Pat Evans, Ronald G. Barnes, Gerald Behan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLC) Modified on 3/20/2023 (JLC). Correct Civil Cover Sheet replaced. (Entered: 03/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less