This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 08:00:46 (UTC).

CASEBOLT v. SAUL

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 CASEBOLT filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against SAUL. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Matthew P. Brookman and James R. Sweeney II. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-04820

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Matthew P. Brookman

Presiding Judge

James R. Sweeney II

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHN G. CASEBOLT

Defendant

ANDREW M. SAUL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ann M. Trzynka

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ANN M. TRZYNKA

P.O. Box 534, 716 Broadway Street

New Haven, IN 46774

Defendant Attorney

Julian Clifford Wierenga

Attorney at UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (Indianapolis)

10 West Market Street, Suite 2100

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#2

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 12/9/2019. (JDC) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) TRANSCRIPT of Administrative Record of Social Security Administration, by ANDREW M. SAUL. (Attachments: #1 court transcript index, #2 administrative records, #3 payment documents, #4 jurisdictional documents part 1, #5 jurisdictional documents part 2, #6 non disability related documents, #7 disability related documents part 1, #8 disability related documents part 2, #9 medical records part 1, #10 medical records part 2, #11 medical records part 3, #12 medical records part 4, #13 medical records part 5, #14 medical records part 6, #15 medical records part 7, #16 medical records part 8, #17 medical records part 9, #18 medical records part 10, #19 medical records part 11, #20 medical records part 12)(Wierenga, Julian) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Julian Clifford Wierenga on behalf of Defendant ANDREW M. SAUL. (Wierenga, Julian) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 12/9/2019. (JDC) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Ann M. Trzynka on behalf of Plaintiff JOHN G. CASEBOLT. (Trzynka, Ann) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • Docket(TEXT ONLY ENTRY) CLERK'S NOTICE - Pursuant to Local Rule 5-12(a), and by agreement with the United States Attorney, no actual service of initial process is required in Social Security appeals brought in the United States District Court for the Southern District of Indiana, unless otherwise ordered. The Social Security Administration will treat notification through the Court's Case Management and Electronic Filing System (CM/ECF) as service under Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Therefore, the Clerk's Office will refrain from issuance of the submitted summons(es) unless otherwise ordered. (TEXT-ENTRY: There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) (REO) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by Plaintiff JOHN G. CASEBOLT. (Trzynka, Ann) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ANDREW M. SAUL, filed by JOHN G. CASEBOLT. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Appeals Council Notice, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Trzynka, Ann) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less