This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/10/2019 at 10:42:38 (UTC).

Cascades Branding Innovation LLC v. True Value Company

Case Summary

On 04/17/2019 Cascades Branding Innovation LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against True Value Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Edmond E. Chang. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02594

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edmond E. Chang

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cascades Branding Innovation LLC

Defendant

True Value Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael R. La Porte

William W. Flachsbart

 

Court Documents

9 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#9

(#9) MOTION by Plaintiff Cascades Branding Innovation LLC for extension of time to file answer (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Flachsbart, William) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#8

(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: On review of the status report, the status hearing of 06/07/2019 is reset to 07/16/2019 at 9:00 a.m., with another status report due by 07/10/2019. Emailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

#7

(#7) STATUS Report (Initial) by Cascades Branding Innovation LLC (Flachsbart, William) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#6

(#6) MAILED patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (kp, ) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

5 #1

Status Report Requirements

#5

(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang:Initial status hearing set for 06/07/2019 at 9:00 a.m. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements at least 3 business days before the initial status hearing. Plaintiff must still file the report even if not all Defendants have been served or have responded to requests to craft a joint report. Because the Procedures are occasionally revised, counsel must read them anew even if counsel has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases. Emailed notice (Attachments: #1 Status Report Requirements) (slb, ) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Cascades Branding Innovation LLC (Flachsbart, William) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Cascades Branding Innovation LLC by Michael R. La Porte (La Porte, Michael) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Cascades Branding Innovation LLC by William W. Flachsbart (Flachsbart, William) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Cascades Branding Innovation LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15727566. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Flachsbart, William) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/01/2019
View Court Documents

(#9) MOTION by Plaintiff Cascades Branding Innovation LLC for extension of time to file answer (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Flachsbart, William) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2019
View Court Documents

(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: On review of the status report, the status hearing of 06/07/2019 is reset to 07/16/2019 at 9:00 a.m., with another status report due by 07/10/2019. Emailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/04/2019
View Court Documents

(#7) STATUS Report (Initial) by Cascades Branding Innovation LLC (Flachsbart, William) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2019

SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant True Value Company (mc, ) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2019
View Court Documents

(#6) MAILED patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (kp, ) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2019
View Court Documents

(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang:Initial status hearing set for 06/07/2019 at 9:00 a.m. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements at least 3 business days before the initial status hearing. Plaintiff must still file the report even if not all Defendants have been served or have responded to requests to craft a joint report. Because the Procedures are occasionally revised, counsel must read them anew even if counsel has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases. Emailed notice (Attachments: #1 Status Report Requirements) (slb, ) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2019

CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, ) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2019
View Court Documents

(#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Cascades Branding Innovation LLC (Flachsbart, William) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2019
View Court Documents

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Cascades Branding Innovation LLC by Michael R. La Porte (La Porte, Michael) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2019
View Court Documents

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Cascades Branding Innovation LLC by William W. Flachsbart (Flachsbart, William) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2019
View Court Documents

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Cascades Branding Innovation LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15727566. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Flachsbart, William) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less