This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/03/2020 at 08:30:55 (UTC).

Casaubon et al v. Watson Lumber Company et al

Case Summary

On 01/03/2020 Casaubon filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Watson Lumber Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jason K. Pulliam and Elizabeth S. Chestney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00002

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jason K. Pulliam

Referral Judge

Elizabeth S. Chestney

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Liesel Casaubon

Pablo Casaubon

Defendants

Watson Lumber Company

Magnolia Flooring

Building Plastics, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gregory T. Van Cleave

Attorney at The Law Office of Albert W. Van Cleave

1520 W. Hildebrand

San Antonio, TX 78201

Defendant Attorneys

Janet L. Smith

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak, & Stewart PC

8117 Preston Road, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75225

Tiffany Cox Stacy

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.

112 E. Pecan Street, Suite 2700

San Antonio, TX 78205

Karen Talbot Gean

Attorney at Bell & Boyd, PLLC

5100 South Thompson, Suite 209

Springdale, AR 72764

David Edward Little

Attorney at Feldmann Nagel Cantafio PLLC

15970 Fitzhugh Road

Dripping Springs, TX 78620

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Consent to Magistrate Jurisdiction by Liesel Casaubon, Pablo Casaubon (Van Cleave, Gregory) Modified on 2/13/2020, to edit (mgr). (Entered: 02/13/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE, ( Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 4/3/2020,, Pretrial Conference set for 4/6/2020 10:30 AM before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney,). Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

#6

(#6) Defendant BPI's Answer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Original Petition ANSWER to Complaint . Attorney David Edward Little added to party Building Plastics, Inc.(pty:dft) by Building Plastics, Inc..(Little, David) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (mgr) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

4 #1

Proposed Order

#4

(#4) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Tiffany Cox Stacy (for Karen Talbot Gean of Bell & Boyd, PLLC) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13093375) by on behalf of Magnolia Flooring, Watson Lumber Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stacy, Tiffany) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#3

(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Watson Lumber Company. (Smith, Janet) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#2

(#2) Pro Hac Vice Letter Attorney Karen Talbot Gean regarding Admission to the Western District of Texas. (mgr) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

1 #4

Supplement

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Magnolia Flooring (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-13028140), filed by Magnolia Flooring. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplement)(Stacy, Tiffany) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Consent to Magistrate Jurisdiction by Liesel Casaubon, Pablo Casaubon (Van Cleave, Gregory) Modified on 2/13/2020, to edit (mgr). (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE, ( Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 4/3/2020,, Pretrial Conference set for 4/6/2020 10:30 AM before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney,). Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Defendant BPI's Answer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Original Petition ANSWER to Complaint . Attorney David Edward Little added to party Building Plastics, Inc.(pty:dft) by Building Plastics, Inc..(Little, David) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (mgr) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Having considered the motion, the Court finds that the movant has complied with the requirements of Local Court Rule AT-1(f)(2). Accordingly, Karen Talbot Gean may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendants Watson Lumber Company and Magnolia Flooring (referred to as Magnolia Flooring Mill, LLC in motion) in this case. By appearing in this case, the attorney becomes subject to the rules of this Court. If the attorney has not already done so, he/she shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court. Additionally, pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rw) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Tiffany Cox Stacy (for Karen Talbot Gean of Bell & Boyd, PLLC) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13093375) by on behalf of Magnolia Flooring, Watson Lumber Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stacy, Tiffany) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Watson Lumber Company. (Smith, Janet) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (mgr) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Jason K. Pulliam. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Pro Hac Vice Letter Attorney Karen Talbot Gean regarding Admission to the Western District of Texas. (mgr) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Magnolia Flooring (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-13028140), filed by Magnolia Flooring. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplement)(Stacy, Tiffany) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Building Plastics, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory T. Van Cleave