This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/11/2020 at 10:15:25 (UTC).

Casanova v. Government Employees Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 06/12/2020 Casanova filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Government Employees Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kenneth M Hoyt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-02076

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kenneth M Hoyt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Salvador Casanova

San Antonio, TX 78213

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Government Employees Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Daniel W Packard

Attorney at The Parkard Law Firm

1100 Nw Loop 410, Suite 104

San Antonio, TX 78213

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Meloney Cargil Perry

Attorney at Perry Law PC

10440 North Central Expressway, Suite 600

Dallas, TX 75231

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Government Employees Insurance Company, filed.(Perry, Meloney) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Salvador Casanova, filed.(Packard, Daniel) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Telephone and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Counsel who filed or removed the action is responsible for placing the conference call and insuring that all parties are on the line. The call shall be placed to (713)250-5613. Telephone Conference set for 10/28/2020 at 08:45 AM before Judge Kenneth M Hoyt.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

2 #3

Exhibit C

2 #2

Exhibit B

2 #1

Exhibit A

#2

(#2) COUNTERCLAIM against Salvador Casanova filed by Government Employees Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Perry, Meloney) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 25th Judicial District of Colorado County, Texas, case number 25612 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24793082) filed by Government Employees Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Perry, Meloney) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Government Employees Insurance Company, filed.(Perry, Meloney) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Salvador Casanova, filed.(Packard, Daniel) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Telephone and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Counsel who filed or removed the action is responsible for placing the conference call and insuring that all parties are on the line. The call shall be placed to (713)250-5613. Telephone Conference set for 10/28/2020 at 08:45 AM before Judge Kenneth M Hoyt.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COUNTERCLAIM against Salvador Casanova filed by Government Employees Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Perry, Meloney) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 25th Judicial District of Colorado County, Texas, case number 25612 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24793082) filed by Government Employees Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Perry, Meloney) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Government Employees Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel W. Packard