This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 08:23:33 (UTC).

Carver v. Texas Department of Criminal Justice et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Carver filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Texas Department of Criminal Justice. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Marcia A. Crone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00616

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marcia A. Crone

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tiffany Carver

Defendants

Keith Watson

Texas Department of Criminal Justice

Rodrick Atwood

Mark W. Stiles Unit Jail

Herman Smith

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Troy James Pradia

Attorney at Law Offices of Troy James Pradia

1415 N. Loop West, Suite 200

Houston, TX 77008

 

Court Documents

6 #1

Affidavit Affidavit of Service

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tiffany Carver. Herman Smith served on 1/25/2020, answer due 2/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Pradia, Troy) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

5 #1

Affidavit Affidavit of Service

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tiffany Carver. Keith Watson served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Pradia, Troy) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

4 #1

Affidavit Affidavit of Service

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tiffany Carver. Mark W. Stiles Unit Jail served on 1/27/2020, answer due 2/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Pradia, Troy) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

3 #1

Affidavit Affidavit of Service

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tiffany Carver. Texas Department of Criminal Justice served on 1/27/2020, answer due 2/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Pradia, Troy) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Issued and emailed to Plaintiff's attorney for service as to Rodrick Atwood, Mark W. Stiles Unit Jail, Herman Smith, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Keith Watson. (fal, ) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7559574.), filed by Tiffany Carver.(Pradia, Troy) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tiffany Carver. Herman Smith served on 1/25/2020, answer due 2/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Pradia, Troy) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tiffany Carver. Keith Watson served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Pradia, Troy) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tiffany Carver. Mark W. Stiles Unit Jail served on 1/27/2020, answer due 2/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Pradia, Troy) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tiffany Carver. Texas Department of Criminal Justice served on 1/27/2020, answer due 2/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Pradia, Troy) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued and emailed to Plaintiff's attorney for service as to Rodrick Atwood, Mark W. Stiles Unit Jail, Herman Smith, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Keith Watson. (fal, ) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (aam, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Tiffany Carver. (aam, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned to District Judge Marcia A. Crone. (aam, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7559574.), filed by Tiffany Carver.(Pradia, Troy) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less