This case was last updated from PACER on 12/29/2019 at 09:27:40 (UTC).

Carver et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/30/2019 Carver filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Ethicon, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Aleta A. Trauger, Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr and Alistair Newbern. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00970

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Alistair Newbern

Presiding Judges

Aleta A. Trauger

Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

James Carver

Virginia Carver

Defendants

Johnson & Johnson

Ethicon LLC

Ethicon Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michelle L. Tiger

Attorney at Kline & Specter, PC

The Nineteenth Floor, 1525 Locust Street

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Christopher A. Gomez

Attorney at Kline & Specter, PC

1525 Locust Street, 18Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Lee B. Balefsky

Attorney at Kline & Specter, PC

1525 Locust Street, 19Th Floor

Philidelphia, PA 19102

Defendant Attorneys

William M. Gage

Attorney at Butler Snow LLP (Ridgeland, MS Office)

1020 Highland Colony Parkway, Suite 1400

Ridgeland, MS 39157

Kari L. Sutherland

Attorney at Butler Snow LLP (Oxford, MS Office)

1200 Jefferson Ave, Suite 205, P.O. Box 1138

Oxford, MS 38655

Ashley Nader Stubbs

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW

P. O. Box 6010

Ridgeland, MS 39158-6010

David B. Thomas

Attorney at Thomas Combs & Spann

P.O. Box 3824

Charleston, WV 25338

Susan M. Robinson

Attorney at Thomas Combs & Spann

P.O. Box 3824

Charleston, WV 25338

James C. Barton, Jr.

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW

One Federal Place, Suite 1000, 1819 Fifth Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203

Christy D. Jones

Attorney at Butler Snow LLP (Ridgeland, MS Office)

1020 Highland Colony Parkway, Suite 1400

Ridgeland, MS 39157

Anita K. Modak-Truran

Attorney at Butler Snow LLP (Nashville)

150 Third Avenue South, Suite 1600

Nashville, TN 37201

 

Court Documents

#59

(#59) ORDER DISMISSING CASE: The parties being in agreement, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all claims against Defendants are hereby dismissed with prejudice, with each party bearing its own costs. The Clerk is direct to close this the file. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 12/20/2019. (mg) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#58

(#58) PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL Agreed Order of Dismissal filed by Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Modak-Truran, Anita) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#57

(#57) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Ethicon Inc.. (Modak-Truran, Anita) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#56

(#56) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Johnson & Johnson. (Modak-Truran, Anita) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#55

(#55) ORDER granting #52 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Susan M. Robinson terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 12/4/2019. (jm) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

52 #1

Exhibit A_Consent

#52

(#52) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Susan M Robinson by Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_Consent)(Modak-Truran, Anita) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

51 #1

Exhibit A_Consent

#51

(#51) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for David B. Thomas by Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_Consent)(Modak-Truran, Anita) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kari L. Sutherland on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Sutherland, Kari) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/1/2019.] (Entered: 10/01/2015)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/1/2019.] (Entered: 01/29/2015)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED for Ethicon, LLC, Ethicon, LLC served on 4/1/2013, answer due 4/22/2013. (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/1/2019.] (Entered: 05/28/2013)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/1/2019.] (Entered: 04/09/2013)

3 #1

Plaintiff Fact Sheet

#3

(#3) TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 40 (Plaintiff Fact Sheet) entered on 03/06/2013 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (Attachment: #1 Plaintiff Fact Sheet) (jap) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/1/2019.] (Entered: 03/14/2013)

#2

(#2) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, and Johnson & Johnson, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (mmw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/1/2019.] (Entered: 03/14/2013)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#2) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, and Johnson & Johnson, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (mmw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/1/2019.] (Entered: 03/14/2013)

165 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#59) ORDER DISMISSING CASE: The parties being in agreement, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all claims against Defendants are hereby dismissed with prejudice, with each party bearing its own costs. The Clerk is direct to close this the file. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 12/20/2019. (mg) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#58) PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL Agreed Order of Dismissal filed by Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Modak-Truran, Anita) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#57) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Ethicon Inc.. (Modak-Truran, Anita) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#56) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Johnson & Johnson. (Modak-Truran, Anita) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • TN State Bar status verified as active for Anita K. Modak-Truran. (jm) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#55) ORDER granting #52 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Susan M. Robinson terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 12/4/2019. (jm) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#54) ORDER granting #51 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney David B. Thomas terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 12/4/2019. (jm) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#53) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 12/3/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jm) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#52) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Susan M Robinson by Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_Consent)(Modak-Truran, Anita) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#51) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for David B. Thomas by Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_Consent)(Modak-Truran, Anita) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) PRETRIAL ORDER # 280 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING ETHICON, INC. CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 8 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. For any cases in the Ethicon, Inc. MDL with a Covidien Wave 1 flag, the stay on the flagged Covidien Wave 1 cases is lifted and the Covidien Wave 1 cases in the Ethicon MDL are incorporated in the Ethicon, Inc., Wave 8 cases and subject to this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 8 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 8 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (kp) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/1/2019.] (Entered: 02/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by James Carver, Virginia Carver. (Gomez, Christopher) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/1/2019.] (Entered: 06/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by William M. Gage on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/1/2019.] (Entered: 01/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kari L. Sutherland on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Sutherland, Kari) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/1/2019.] (Entered: 10/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/1/2019.] (Entered: 01/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED for Ethicon, LLC, Ethicon, LLC served on 4/1/2013, answer due 4/22/2013. (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/1/2019.] (Entered: 05/28/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/1/2019.] (Entered: 04/09/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 40 (Plaintiff Fact Sheet) entered on 03/06/2013 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (Attachment: #1 Plaintiff Fact Sheet) (jap) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/1/2019.] (Entered: 03/14/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, and Johnson & Johnson, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (mmw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/1/2019.] (Entered: 03/14/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $350.00. Receipt # 0425-2280915. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mmw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/1/2019.] (Entered: 03/14/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant

Latest cases where Ethicon Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michelle L. Tiger

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lee Balefsky