This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/31/2020 at 09:07:35 (UTC).

Carvajal v. Medtronics, Inc et al

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 Carvajal filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Medtronics, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew S Hanen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00347

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew S Hanen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Yolanda O Carvajal

Defendants

Medtronics, Inc

Covidien LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jason J. Joy

Attorney at Jason Joy & Associates

909 Texas Street, Suite 1801

Houston, TX 77002

Ben C Martin

Attorney at Martin Baughman PLLC

3710 Rawlins Street, Suite 1230

Dallas, TX 75219

Colin Gerald Orion Wood

Attorney at Jason J. Joy & Associates, PLLC

909 Texas St, Ste 1801

Houston, TX 77002

Laura Jean Baughman

Attorney at Martin Baughman, PLLC

3710 Rawlins Street, Suite 1230, Dallas

Dallas, TX 75219

Defendant Attorneys

Brittany Nicole Vanek

Attorney at Shook Hardy & Baco LLP

600 Travis, Suite 3400

Houston, TX 77002

Bryan T Pratt

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon, LLP

2555 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time; Motion-related deadline set re: #15 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support. Responses due by 3/31/2020.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(rhawkins) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

21 #1

Proposed Order

#21

(#21) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Defendants' 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss by Yolanda O Carvajal, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Martin, Ben) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference set for 5/5/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy, filed. (bwhite, 4) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

19 #1

Proposed Order

#19

(#19) Unopposed MOTION for Continuance of Initial Conference by Covidien LP, Medtronics, Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vanek, Brittany) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

#17

(#17) MOTION for Bryan T. Pratt to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Covidien LP, Medtronics, Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/24/2020. #1 Pro Hac Vice) (Vanek, Brittany) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

15 #1

Proposed Order

#15

(#15) MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Covidien LP, Medtronics, Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vanek, Brittany) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Andrew S Hanen. Judge Nancy F Atlas no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (dhansen, 4) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

#6

(#6) RECUSAL ORDER. Judge Nancy F Atlas recused. Deadlines in scheduling orders subsist. Court settings are vacated.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

5 #1

Summons.Covidien

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Covidien LP, Medtronics, Inc. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons.Covidien)(rguerrero, 4) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/30/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas. (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

#3

(#3) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Medtronics, Inc, filed.(Joy, Jason) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#2

(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Covidien LP, filed.(Joy, Jason) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Covidien LP, Medtronics, Inc (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24078028) filed by Yolanda O Carvajal. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Joy, Jason) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time; Motion-related deadline set re: #15 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support. Responses due by 3/31/2020.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(rhawkins) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Defendants' 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss by Yolanda O Carvajal, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Martin, Ben) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference set for 5/5/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy, filed. (bwhite, 4) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Unopposed MOTION for Continuance of Initial Conference by Covidien LP, Medtronics, Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vanek, Brittany) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER granting #17 Motion for Bryan T. Pratt to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for Bryan T. Pratt to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Covidien LP, Medtronics, Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/24/2020. #1 Pro Hac Vice) (Vanek, Brittany) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Covidien LP, Medtronics, Inc, filed.(Vanek, Brittany) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Covidien LP, Medtronics, Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vanek, Brittany) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Yolanda O Carvajal, filed.(Joy, Jason) (Entered: 02/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Medtronics, Inc served on 2/5/2020, answer due 2/26/2020, filed.(Joy, Jason) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Colin G. Wood on behalf of Yolanda O Carvajal, filed. (Wood, Colin) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Baughman on behalf of Yolanda O Carvajal, filed. (Baughman, Laura) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Ben C. Martin on behalf of Yolanda O Carvajal, filed. (Martin, Ben) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Andrew S Hanen. Judge Nancy F Atlas no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (dhansen, 4) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RECUSAL ORDER. Judge Nancy F Atlas recused. Deadlines in scheduling orders subsist. Court settings are vacated.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Covidien LP, Medtronics, Inc. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons.Covidien)(rguerrero, 4) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/30/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas. (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Medtronics, Inc, filed.(Joy, Jason) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Covidien LP, filed.(Joy, Jason) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Covidien LP, Medtronics, Inc (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24078028) filed by Yolanda O Carvajal. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Joy, Jason) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COVIDIEN LP is a litigant

Latest cases where Medtronic, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laura J Baughman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JASON JOSEPH JOY