This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/04/2022 at 08:34:47 (UTC).

Cartwright et al v. U-Haul International Incorporated

Case Summary

On 10/05/2022 Cartwright filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against U-Haul International Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael T Liburdi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01693

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael T Liburdi

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Christine Cartwright

Cheyenne Emery Hart

Defendant

U-Haul International Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Courtney Maccarone

Attorney at Levi & Korsinsky LLP - New York, NY

55 Broadway, 10Th Fl.

New York, NY 10006

Mark Reich

Attorney at Levi & Korsinsky LLP - New York, NY

55 Broadway, 10Th Fl.

New York, NY 10006

Jennifer Cummins Rethemeier

Attorney at Dalimonte Rueb Stoller LLP - Phoenix, AZ

2425 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 500

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Paul Lincoln Stoller

Attorney at Dalimonte Rueb Stoller LLP - Phoenix, AZ

2425 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 500

Phoenix, AZ 85016

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Christine Cartwright, Cheyenne Emery Hart. (Rethemeier, Jennifer) (BAC) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

#3

(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-21176348. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Eileen S Willett. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-01693-PHX-ESW. Magistrate Election form attached. (BAC) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to U-Haul International Incorporated. (BAC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 10/05/2022)

11 #6

Main Document

11 #1

Proposed Order

#13

(#9) ORDER granting (Doc. 11 in case 2:22-cv-01565-MTL) Motion to Consolidate Cases. The Clerk shall transfer and consolidate case numbers CV-22-01565-PHX-MTL with 22-CV-01608-PHX-JFM; 22-CV-01625-PHX-ROS; 22-CV-01631-PHX-SMB; 22-CV-01658-PHX-SPL; and 22-CV-01693-PHX-ESW. All future filings shall bear case number CV-22-01565-PHX-MTL as the lead case and be submitted in substantially the same format as the caption of this order. All future filings related to these cases shall be filed in CV-22-01565-PHX-MTL. Plaintiff shall file a single operative Consolidated Complaint in the lead case within 30 days of the date of this Order. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 10/28/2022. (Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-01565-MTL et al.) (KJ) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

#5

(#5) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Christine Cartwright: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 10/06/2022 to U-Haul International, Inc. . (Rethemeier, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

#7

(#7) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Courtney Maccarone. Reason for return: Insufficient Address - Unable to Forward. Document numbers #3 , #4 . (SST) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

#8

(#8) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Mark Reich. Reason for return: Insufficient Address - Unable to Forward. Document numbers #3 , #4 . (SST) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting (Doc. 11 in case 2:22-cv-01565-MTL) Motion to Consolidate Cases. The Clerk shall transfer and consolidate case numbers CV-22-01565-PHX-MTL with 22-CV-01608-PHX-JFM; 22-CV-01625-PHX-ROS; 22-CV-01631-PHX-SMB; 22-CV-01658-PHX-SPL; and 22-CV-01693-PHX-ESW. All future filings shall bear case number CV-22-01565-PHX-MTL as the lead case and be submitted in substantially the same format as the caption of this order. All future filings related to these cases shall be filed in CV-22-01565-PHX-MTL. Plaintiff shall file a single operative Consolidated Complaint in the lead case within 30 days of the date of this Order. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 10/28/2022. (Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-01565-MTL et al.) (KJ) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Mark Reich. Reason for return: Insufficient Address - Unable to Forward. Document numbers #3 , #4 . (SST) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Courtney Maccarone. Reason for return: Insufficient Address - Unable to Forward. Document numbers #3 , #4 . (SST) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Felicia Durgan. **Re-docketed by Clerk using the correct event for statistical purposes.** (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Associated Cases: CV-22-01565-PHX-MTL, CV-22-01608-PHX-JFM, CV-22-01625-PHX-ROS, CV-22-01631-PHX-SMB, CV-22-01658-PHX-SPL, CV-22-01693-PHX-ESW)(DXD) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Mark Reich, Courtney Maccarone on behalf of Plaintiffs Christine Cartwright, Cheyenne Emery Hart. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Christine Cartwright: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 10/06/2022 to U-Haul International, Inc. . (Rethemeier, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to U-Haul International Incorporated. (BAC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-21176348. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Eileen S Willett. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-01693-PHX-ESW. Magistrate Election form attached. (BAC) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Christine Cartwright, Cheyenne Emery Hart. (Rethemeier, Jennifer) (BAC) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $402.00, receipt number AAZDC-21176348 filed by Christine Cartwright, Cheyenne Emery Hart. (Rethemeier, Jennifer) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAC) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U-HAUL INTERNATIONAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer C. Rethemeier

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Courtney Elizabeth Maccarone

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul L. Stoller