This case was last updated from PACER on 08/13/2021 at 05:40:31 (UTC).

Carter v. U.S. Department of Justice

Case Summary

On 08/11/2021 Carter filed a Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act lawsuit against U S Department of Justice. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are LaShann DeArcy Hall and Lois Bloom. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-04536

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LaShann DeArcy Hall

Referral Judge

Lois Bloom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Darryl Carter

Brooklyn, NY 11217

Defendant

U.S. Department of Justice

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

13 #1

*Restricted*

13 #13

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

#12

(#12) NOTICE OF APPEAL from #10 Order. Document filed by Darryl Carter. Form D-P is due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit..(nd) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/12/2021.] (Entered: 08/09/2021)

#11

(#11) LETTER from D. Carter, dated 8/6/21 re: "THE DEAD FISHERMAN & THE SENATE ARMED FORCES COMMITTEE INVESTIGATION REQUEST PER MILITARY ILLEGAL SURVEILLANCE, HARASSMENT, AND THREATS DIRECTED TOWARD PLAINTIFF"- The FOIA complaint seeks to unearth all documents, papers, etc. relating to the inquiry of a federal government deep seeded cover-up[likely felonious] activity of one or more federal officials. The conditions in which the plaintiff currently resides represent extreme and radical human rights violations all aimed at covering up and protecting the responsible federal government officials. Document filed by Darryl Carter.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/12/2021.] (Entered: 08/06/2021)

#10

(#10) TRANSFER ORDER: The Court transfers the action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to terminate all motions filed in this action. Whether Plaintiff should be permitted to proceed further without payment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. This order closes this case. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 44445 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 8/4/21) (rdz) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/12/2021.] (Entered: 08/05/2021)

#9

(#9) LETTER from D. Carter, dated 7/31/21 re: "HARASSMENT FOLLOWING DOC #8, PLAINTIFF HAS NOTHING TO DO WITH MEXICO, PLEASE CONTROL YOUR JUDICIAL OFFICERS" - In short, it is the duty and obligation of this Court to control its people and operatives and the influence exerted, on such individuals in this Court via outside of this court including via the Eastern District Court in Brooklyn, New York etc. Document filed by Darryl Carter.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/12/2021.] (Entered: 08/02/2021)

#8

(#8) LETTER from D. Carter, dated 7/30/21 re: "CLERK'S OFFICE MISCONDUCT" - Please note that the Clerk's Office is engaging in misconduct which interferes with the timely and orderly administration of the Court's business etc. The Clerk's Office has no authority to decide what is or is not acceptable email address to submit papers to the Court, and seeks a cover-up solution in the background via its relationship with Microsoft for emails service. Document filed by Darryl Carter.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/12/2021.] (Entered: 07/30/2021)

#7

(#7) MOTION FOR PERMISSION FOR ELECTRONIC CASE FILING, re: for Permission for Darryl Carter to participate in electronic case filing in this case. Document filed by Darryl Carter.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/12/2021.] (Entered: 07/28/2021)

#6

(#6) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Darryl Carter.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/12/2021.] (Entered: 07/23/2021)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Dept. of Justice, Civil Division, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Darryl Carter. (sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/12/2021.] (Entered: 07/23/2021)

#4

(#4) DECLARATION In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for CM/ECF Case Filing. Document filed by Darryl Carter. (rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/12/2021.] (Entered: 07/22/2021)

#3

(#3) PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Darryl Carter consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Darryl Carter..(rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/12/2021.] (Entered: 07/22/2021)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Justice. Document filed by Darryl Carter..(rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/12/2021.] (Entered: 07/22/2021)

#1

(#1) REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Darryl Carter.(rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/12/2021.] (Entered: 07/22/2021)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:21-cv-06242. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for #12 Notice of Appeal filed by Darryl Carter were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals..(nd) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/12/2021.] (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTransmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #12 Notice of Appeal..(nd) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/12/2021.] (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF APPEAL from #10 Order. Document filed by Darryl Carter. Form D-P is due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit..(nd) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/12/2021.] (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) LETTER from D. Carter, dated 8/6/21 re: "THE DEAD FISHERMAN & THE SENATE ARMED FORCES COMMITTEE INVESTIGATION REQUEST PER MILITARY ILLEGAL SURVEILLANCE, HARASSMENT, AND THREATS DIRECTED TOWARD PLAINTIFF"- The FOIA complaint seeks to unearth all documents, papers, etc. relating to the inquiry of a federal government deep seeded cover-up[likely felonious] activity of one or more federal officials. The conditions in which the plaintiff currently resides represent extreme and radical human rights violations all aimed at covering up and protecting the responsible federal government officials. Document filed by Darryl Carter.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/12/2021.] (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) TRANSFER ORDER: The Court transfers the action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to terminate all motions filed in this action. Whether Plaintiff should be permitted to proceed further without payment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. This order closes this case. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 44445 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 8/4/21) (rdz) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/12/2021.] (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) LETTER from D. Carter, dated 7/31/21 re: "HARASSMENT FOLLOWING DOC #8, PLAINTIFF HAS NOTHING TO DO WITH MEXICO, PLEASE CONTROL YOUR JUDICIAL OFFICERS" - In short, it is the duty and obligation of this Court to control its people and operatives and the influence exerted, on such individuals in this Court via outside of this court including via the Eastern District Court in Brooklyn, New York etc. Document filed by Darryl Carter.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/12/2021.] (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) LETTER from D. Carter, dated 7/30/21 re: "CLERK'S OFFICE MISCONDUCT" - Please note that the Clerk's Office is engaging in misconduct which interferes with the timely and orderly administration of the Court's business etc. The Clerk's Office has no authority to decide what is or is not acceptable email address to submit papers to the Court, and seeks a cover-up solution in the background via its relationship with Microsoft for emails service. Document filed by Darryl Carter.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/12/2021.] (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION FOR PERMISSION FOR ELECTRONIC CASE FILING, re: for Permission for Darryl Carter to participate in electronic case filing in this case. Document filed by Darryl Carter.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/12/2021.] (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/12/2021.] (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis See Document #1 by Darryl Carter. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Darryl Carter.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/12/2021.] (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Dept. of Justice, Civil Division, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Darryl Carter. (sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/12/2021.] (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DECLARATION In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for CM/ECF Case Filing. Document filed by Darryl Carter. (rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/12/2021.] (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Darryl Carter consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Darryl Carter..(rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/12/2021.] (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/12/2021.] (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Justice. Document filed by Darryl Carter..(rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/12/2021.] (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Darryl Carter.(rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/12/2021.] (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE is a litigant