This case was last updated from PACER on 10/11/2019 at 07:56:11 (UTC).

Carter v. University of Texas at Dallas et al

Case Summary

On 08/12/2019 Carter filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against University of Texas at Dallas. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Paul D. Borman and R. Steven Whalen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-12381

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul D. Borman

Referral Judge

R. Steven Whalen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Geaniece D. Carter

Grosse Pointe Farms, MI 48236

Geaniece D Carter [E-filer]

Grosse Pointe Farms, MI 48236

Defendants

University of Texas at Dallas

George Fair

Barbara Ashmore

Carolyn Bray

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Scot M Graydon

Attorney at Attorney General of Texas

Po Box 12548

Austin, TX 78711

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Geaniece D. Carter against defendants (DPer) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

#2

(#4) ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs and granting request for service by the U.S. Marshal. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

#4

TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #4 Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs on Geaniece D. Carter at P.O. Box 361184, Grosse Pointe Farms, MI 48236. (DTof) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

#5

(#5) Pro Se Application for E-filing submitted by Geaniece D Carter [E-filer] [APPROVED] (NAhm) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (NAhm) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#7

(#7) ACKNOWLEDGMENT from U.S. Marshal Service of Receipt of Service of Process Documents. (NAhm) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

9 #1

Prop Order

#9

(#15) RESPONSE to #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Carter [E-filer], Geaniece) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#16

(#16) MOTION to Disqualify Counsel by All Plaintiffs. (Carter [E-filer], Geaniece) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#22

(#22) ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S #16 Motion to Disqualify Counsel - Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

#21

(#21) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S #14 Motion to Amend/Correct- Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

#14

(#14) MOTION to Amend/Correct by All Plaintiffs. (Carter [E-filer], Geaniece) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

#20

(#20) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RECOMMENDING DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANT'S #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Carolyn Bray, Barbara Ashmore, George Fair, University of Texas at Dallas - Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

#17

(#17) Amended MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Barbara Ashmore, Carolyn Bray, George Fair, University of Texas at Dallas. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support) (Graydon, Scot) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

#19

(#19) ORDER Requiring Response to #17 Motion to Dismiss - Plaintiff's Response due by 10/28/2019 - Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

17 #1

Brief in Support

#18

(#18) RESPONSE to #16 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by Barbara Ashmore, Carolyn Bray, George Fair, University of Texas at Dallas. (Graydon, Scot) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S #16 Motion to Disqualify Counsel - Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S #14 Motion to Amend/Correct- Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RECOMMENDING DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANT'S #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Carolyn Bray, Barbara Ashmore, George Fair, University of Texas at Dallas - Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER Requiring Response to #17 Motion to Dismiss - Plaintiff's Response due by 10/28/2019 - Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) RESPONSE to #16 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by Barbara Ashmore, Carolyn Bray, George Fair, University of Texas at Dallas. (Graydon, Scot) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Amended MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Barbara Ashmore, Carolyn Bray, George Fair, University of Texas at Dallas. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support) (Graydon, Scot) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION to Disqualify Counsel by All Plaintiffs. (Carter [E-filer], Geaniece) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) RESPONSE to #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Carter [E-filer], Geaniece) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION to Amend/Correct by All Plaintiffs. (Carter [E-filer], Geaniece) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Carter [E-filer], Geaniece) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Dismiss by Barbara Ashmore, Carolyn Bray, George Fair, University of Texas at Dallas. (Attachments: #1 Prop Order) (Graydon, Scot) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ACKNOWLEDGMENT from U.S. Marshal Service of Receipt of Service of Process Documents. (NAhm) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (NAhm) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • Pro Se E-filing Account Created for Geaniece D Carter [E-filer]. (NAhm) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Pro Se Application for E-filing submitted by Geaniece D Carter [E-filer] [APPROVED] (NAhm) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #4 Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs on Geaniece D. Carter at P.O. Box 361184, Grosse Pointe Farms, MI 48236. (DTof) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs and granting request for service by the U.S. Marshal. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) APPLICATION to proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Geaniece D. Carter. (DPer) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Geaniece D. Carter against defendants (DPer) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.