This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 08:00:53 (UTC).

Carter v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Carter filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Social Security Administration, Commissioner. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Madeline Hughes Haikala. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00018

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Madeline Hughes Haikala

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tonya Carter

Defendant

Social Security Administration, Commissioner

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Myron K Allenstein

Attorney at ALLENSTEIN & ALLENSTEIN LLC

141 South 9Th Street

Gadsden, AL 35901

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) ORDER: The Court grants plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis in this action. (Doc. #2 ). The Clerk is directed to file this action wtihout prepayment of a fee. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 1/6/2020. (YMB) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#2

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#1

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tonya Carter. Social Security Administration, Commissioner served on 1/28/2020, answer due 4/27/2020. (KEK) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Delivered to US Marshals for service. (KEK) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, Commissioner, filed by Tonya Carter.(Allenstein, Myron) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER: The Court grants plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis in this action. (Doc. #2 ). The Clerk is directed to file this action wtihout prepayment of a fee. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 1/6/2020. (YMB) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tonya Carter. (KEK) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, Commissioner, filed by Tonya Carter.(KEK) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.