This case was last updated from PACER on 10/17/2020 at 09:53:30 (UTC).

CARTER v. LANDSTAR INWAY INC. et al

Case Summary

On 08/18/2020 CARTER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LANDSTAR INWAY INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert B. Kugler and Ann Marie Donio. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-10701

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert B. Kugler

Referral Judge

Ann Marie Donio

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LARAE CARTER

Defendants

DAVID SKIP O'CONNOR

LANDSTAR INWAY INC.

JOHN DOES 1-5

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERT J. HENSLER

Attorney at ROBERT HENSLER, LLC

601 Haddon Avenue

Collingswood, NJ 08108

Defendant Attorneys

DAWN L. JENNINGS

Attorney at Salmon Ricchezza Singer & Turchi LLP

1601 Market Street, Suite 1705

Philadelphia, PA 19103

JON MICHAEL DUMONT

Attorney at Salmon Ricchezza Singer & Turchi LLP

123 Egg Harbor Road, Suite 406

Sewell, NJ 08080

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER IN AN ARBITRATION CASE: Telephone Status Conference set for 12/7/2020 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. The time within which to file a motion to amend the pleadings or a motion to join new parties will expire on 12/30/2020. Pretrial Factual Discovery due by 3/21/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 9/22/2020. (tf, ) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by DAVID SKIP O'CONNOR.(JENNINGS, DAWN) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by LANDSTAR INWAY INC..(JENNINGS, DAWN) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by JON MICHAEL DUMONT on behalf of LANDSTAR INWAY INC. (DUMONT, JON) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by LANDSTAR INWAY INC.. (JENNINGS, DAWN) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

#2

(#2) Order Initial Conference set for 9/22/2020 11:30 AM in Camden - Room 2010 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 08/18/2020. (pr, ) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit Complaint

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LANDSTAR INWAY INC. from Superior Court of New Jersey Gloucester County, case number L-872-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11224673), filed by LANDSTAR INWAY INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint)(JENNINGS, DAWN) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER IN AN ARBITRATION CASE: Telephone Status Conference set for 12/7/2020 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. The time within which to file a motion to amend the pleadings or a motion to join new parties will expire on 12/30/2020. Pretrial Factual Discovery due by 3/21/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 9/22/2020. (tf, ) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Initial Scheduling Conference held via telephone on 9/22/2020. (sb) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by DAVID SKIP O'CONNOR.(JENNINGS, DAWN) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by LANDSTAR INWAY INC..(JENNINGS, DAWN) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • Docket(#6) TEXT ORDER: The initial scheduling conference on 9/22/2020 at 11:30 A.M. shall be conducted VIA TELEPHONE. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference call: 1-888-684-8852 / 2828702# / 654321#. Additionally, the joint discovery plan shall either be filed on the docket or emailed to njdnef_donio@njd.uscourts.gov. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 9/10/2020. (slc) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by JON MICHAEL DUMONT on behalf of LANDSTAR INWAY INC. (DUMONT, JON) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by LANDSTAR INWAY INC.. (JENNINGS, DAWN) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Nature of Suit,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (pr, ) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • Docket(#3) CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (pr, ) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Order Initial Conference set for 9/22/2020 11:30 AM in Camden - Room 2010 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 08/18/2020. (pr, ) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketJudge Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dd, ) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LANDSTAR INWAY INC. from Superior Court of New Jersey Gloucester County, case number L-872-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11224673), filed by LANDSTAR INWAY INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint)(JENNINGS, DAWN) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less