This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/26/2021 at 09:06:08 (UTC).

Carter v. HESS CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 10/27/2021 Carter filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HESS CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virgin Islands District. The Judges overseeing this case are Wilma A. Lewis and George W. Cannon, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00297

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Wilma A. Lewis

Referral Judge

George W. Cannon, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Arthur Carter

Christiansted, VI 00821

Defendants

HESS CORPORATION

2162 Church Street

Christiansted, VI 00820

Hess Oil New York Corp.

2162 Church Street

Christiansted, VI 00820

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Arthur M. Murray

Attorney at MURRAY LAW FIRM

650 Poydras Street, Suite 2150

New Orleans, LA 70130

John-Russell Bart Pate

Attorney at J.R. Pate, PC - Law Office

P.O. Box 890Royal Dane Mall 10-Aa

St. Thomas, VI 00804

Korey A Nelson

Attorney at Burns and Charest LLP

365 Canal Street Ste. 1170 , La 70130

365 Canal Street Ste. 1170, LA 70130

Warren T Burns

Attorney at Burns Charest LLP

900 Jackson Street, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75202

Defendant Attorneys

Carl A Beckstedt, III

Attorney at Beckstedt and Associate

2162 Church Street

Christiansted, VI 00820-4604

Michael A Rogers

Attorney at Beckstedt & Kuczynski LLP

2162 Church St

Christiansted, VI 00820

Carolyn F. O'Connor

Attorney at Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker LLP

200 Campus Driveste 4Th Fl.

Florham Park, NJ 07932

Joseph T. Hanlon

Attorney at Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker LLP

200 Campus Driveste 4Th Fl.

Florham Park, NJ 07932

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER (GWC) dated 12/13/2021 accepting and granting Stipulation of Partial Stay Pending Resolution of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed in McNamara v. Hess Corporation et al., 1:20-cv-00060-WAL-GWC, ECF No. 102, except as noted; staying all discovery pending further order of the Court (KMD) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#14

(#14) DISCOVERY MEMORANDUM-Rule 16 by Plaintiff Arthur Carter. (Nelson, Korey) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

#13

(#13) DISCOVERY MEMORANDUM-Rule 16 by Defendants HESS CORPORATION, Hess Oil New York Corp.. (O'Connor, Carolyn) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A Rogers on behalf of Defendants HESS CORPORATION, Hess Oil New York Corp. (Rogers, Michael) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Service of Rule 26 Initial Disclosure by HESS CORPORATION, Hess Oil New York Corp. (O'Connor, Carolyn) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

#10

(#10) ORDER (GWC) dated 11/5/2021 Initial Disclosures due by 11/19/2021., Discovery Memorandum due by 12/6/2021., Initial Conference set for 12/13/2021 at 11:00 AM (AST) in STX Courtroom 3 before US Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (KMD) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by John-Russell Bart Pate on behalf of Plaintiff Arthur Carter (Pate, John-Russell) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Carolyn F. O'Connor on behalf of Defendants HESS CORPORATION, Hess Oil New York Corp. (O'Connor, Carolyn) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph T. Hanlon on behalf of Defendants HESS CORPORATION, Hess Oil New York Corp. (Hanlon, Joseph) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by Hess Oil New York Corp.. (Beckstedt, Carl) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hess Oil New York Corp. identifying Corporate Parent HESS CORPORATION for Hess Oil New York Corp... (Beckstedt, Carl) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by HESS CORPORATION. (Beckstedt, Carl) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint by HESS CORPORATION. (Beckstedt, Carl) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Carl A Beckstedt, III on behalf of Defendants HESS CORPORATION, Hess Oil New York Corp. (Beckstedt, Carl) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Defendants Hess Oil New York Corp., HESS CORPORATION from Superior Court, Division of St. Croix, case number SX-21-CV-629. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AVIDC-964771)filed by Hess Oil New York Corp., HESS CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Beckstedt, Carl) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTERMINATE HEARING #10 ORDER (TNS) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER (GWC) dated 12/13/2021 accepting and granting Stipulation of Partial Stay Pending Resolution of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed in McNamara v. Hess Corporation et al., 1:20-cv-00060-WAL-GWC, ECF No. 102, except as noted; staying all discovery pending further order of the Court (KMD) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) DISCOVERY MEMORANDUM-Rule 16 by Plaintiff Arthur Carter. (Nelson, Korey) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) DISCOVERY MEMORANDUM-Rule 16 by Defendants HESS CORPORATION, Hess Oil New York Corp.. (O'Connor, Carolyn) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A Rogers on behalf of Defendants HESS CORPORATION, Hess Oil New York Corp. (Rogers, Michael) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Service of Rule 26 Initial Disclosure by HESS CORPORATION, Hess Oil New York Corp. (O'Connor, Carolyn) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER (GWC) dated 11/5/2021 Initial Disclosures due by 11/19/2021., Discovery Memorandum due by 12/6/2021., Initial Conference set for 12/13/2021 at 11:00 AM (AST) in STX Courtroom 3 before US Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (KMD) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by John-Russell Bart Pate on behalf of Plaintiff Arthur Carter (Pate, John-Russell) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Carolyn F. O'Connor on behalf of Defendants HESS CORPORATION, Hess Oil New York Corp. (O'Connor, Carolyn) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph T. Hanlon on behalf of Defendants HESS CORPORATION, Hess Oil New York Corp. (Hanlon, Joseph) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by Hess Oil New York Corp.. (Beckstedt, Carl) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hess Oil New York Corp. identifying Corporate Parent HESS CORPORATION for Hess Oil New York Corp... (Beckstedt, Carl) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by HESS CORPORATION. (Beckstedt, Carl) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint by HESS CORPORATION. (Beckstedt, Carl) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Carl A Beckstedt, III on behalf of Defendants HESS CORPORATION, Hess Oil New York Corp. (Beckstedt, Carl) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Defendants Hess Oil New York Corp., HESS CORPORATION from Superior Court, Division of St. Croix, case number SX-21-CV-629. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AVIDC-964771)filed by Hess Oil New York Corp., HESS CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Beckstedt, Carl) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hess Oil New York Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael A Rogers(Designation Retained)