This case was last updated from PACER on 12/19/2020 at 09:10:55 (UTC).

Carter v. Florida Department of Corrections

Case Summary

On 10/20/2020 Carter filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Florida Department of Corrections. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is William P. Dimitrouleas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-14371

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William P. Dimitrouleas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jermaine T. Carter

Indiantown, FL 34956

Defendant

Florida Department of Corrections

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Noticing 2254 SAG Broward and North

MaryEllen M. Farrell

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

1515 North Flagler Drive, Suite 900

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

 

Court Documents

14 #5

Transcripts

14 #4

Transcripts

14 #3

Transcripts

14 #2

Transcripts

14 #1

Transcripts

#14

(#14) NOTICE by Florida Department of Corrections re #13 Appendix, #12 Response to Order to Show Cause (Attachments: #1 Transcripts, #2 Transcripts, #3 Transcripts, #4 Transcripts, #5 Transcripts) (Farrell, MaryEllen) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

13 #4

Appendix

13 #3

Appendix

13 #2

Appendix

13 #1

Appendix

#13

(#13) APPENDIX to #12 Response to Order to Show Cause by Florida Department of Corrections (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Appendix, #3 Appendix, #4 Appendix)(Farrell, MaryEllen) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

#12

(#12) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #3 Order to Show Cause by Florida Department of Corrections. (Farrell, MaryEllen) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

#10

(#10) ORDER denying as moot #9 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court already granted relief. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 11/17/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jermaine T. Carter. (amb) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jermaine T. Carter. (amb) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by MaryEllen M. Farrell on behalf of Florida Department of Corrections. Attorney MaryEllen M. Farrell added to party Florida Department of Corrections(pty:dft). (Farrell, MaryEllen) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

#5

(#5) INITIAL ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/21/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 28 U.S.C. 2254. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/21/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE by Florida Department of Corrections re #13 Appendix, #12 Response to Order to Show Cause (Attachments: #1 Transcripts, #2 Transcripts, #3 Transcripts, #4 Transcripts, #5 Transcripts) (Farrell, MaryEllen) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) APPENDIX to #12 Response to Order to Show Cause by Florida Department of Corrections (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Appendix, #3 Appendix, #4 Appendix)(Farrell, MaryEllen) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #3 Order to Show Cause by Florida Department of Corrections. (Farrell, MaryEllen) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Compliance re #10 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff) (amb) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER denying as moot #9 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court already granted relief. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 11/17/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jermaine T. Carter. (amb) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Granting to the extent that the plaintiff need not prepay even a partial filing fee in this case, or to prepay costs such as for service of process. USM Service NOT Ordered. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 11/10/2020. (jb01) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jermaine T. Carter. (amb) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by MaryEllen M. Farrell on behalf of Florida Department of Corrections. Attorney MaryEllen M. Farrell added to party Florida Department of Corrections(pty:dft). (Farrell, MaryEllen) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) INITIAL ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/21/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REQUIRING FEE OR IFP MOTION. ORDER REQUIRING PAYMENT OF FILING FEE OR FILING OF MOTION TO PROCEED IFP WITH DETAILED AFFIDAVIT Filing Fee due by 11/4/2020. Motions due by 11/4/2020. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/21/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 28 U.S.C. 2254. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/21/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. (daa) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. Filing fee $ 5.00 (Filing fee not paid/IFP not paid), filed by Jermaine T. Carter.(daa) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less