This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 07:56:05 (UTC).

Carter v. Equifax Information Services, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 a Finance - Consumer Credit case was filed by Carter against Equifax Information Services, LLC in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00601

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Western District

Judge Details

Charles R. Simpson, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christina M. Carter

Defendant

Equifax Information Services, LLC

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III. (ALS) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (ALS) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER FOR MEETING & REPORT (EBOC) by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III on 10/21/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/2/2019. cc: Counsel of Record (KD) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Equifax, Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC. by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Kilpatrick, Melanie) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Kilpatrick, Melanie) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2929938) filed by Christina M. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (ALS) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER FOR MEETING & REPORT (EBOC) by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III on 10/21/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/2/2019. cc: Counsel of Record (KD) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Equifax, Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC. by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Kilpatrick, Melanie) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Kilpatrick, Melanie) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (ALS) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III. (ALS) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2929938) filed by Christina M. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (ALS) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.