This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/24/2022 at 06:13:00 (UTC).

Carter et al v. Meta Platforms Inc et al

Case Summary

On 06/21/2022 Carter filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Meta Platforms Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Ada Brown. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-01343

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ada Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Stephanie Carter

Stephanie ANF F.M. Carter

Defendants

Meta Platforms, Inc.

Facebook Holdings, LLC

Facebook Operations, LLC

Facebook Payments, Inc.

Facebook Technologies, LLC

Instagram, LLC

Siculus, Inc.

Meta Platforms Inc

Facebook Holdings LLC

Facebook Operations LLC

Facebook Payments Inc

Facebook Technologies LLC

Instagram LLC

Siculus Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kyle Christopher Herbert

Attorney at HerbertLawFirm PLLC

3411 Richmond Avenue, Suite 400

Houston, TX 77046

Andrew C Smith

Attorney at Herbert Law Firm PLLC

3411 Richmond Avenue, Suite 400

Houston, TX 77046

Clinton Andreus Richardson

Attorney at Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles PC

234 Commerce

Montgomery, AL 36103

Rachel E Berkley

Attorney at Herbert & McClelland, LLP

3411 Richmond Avenue, Suite 400

Houston, TX 77046

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Facebook Holdings, LLC, Facebook Operations, LLC, Facebook Payments, Inc., Facebook Technologies, LLC, Instagram, LLC, Meta Platforms, Inc., Siculus, Inc. filed by Stephanie Carter, Stephanie ANF F.M. Carter. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-12907881) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Herbert, Kyle) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

#2

(#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sxf) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Facebook Holdings LLC, Facebook Operations LLC, Facebook Payments Inc, Facebook Technologies LLC, Instagram LLC, Meta Platforms Inc, Siculus Inc. (sxf) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to All Defendants. Sent on 6/23/2022. (Herbert, Kyle) Modified text on 7/1/2022 (ygl). (Entered: 06/24/2022)

#5

(#5) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-12924710) filed by Stephanie Carter (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) COGS)Attorney Clinton Andreus Richardson added to party Stephanie Carter(pty:pla) (Richardson, Clinton) (Main Document 5 replaced/flattened PDF on 6/29/2022) (ygl). (Entered: 06/28/2022)

5 #1

Additional Page(s) COGS

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Clinton Andreus Richardson on behalf of Stephanie Carter. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Richardson, Clinton) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to All Defendants. (Richardson, Clinton) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to All Defendants. (Richardson, Clinton) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Clinton Andreus Richardson on behalf of Stephanie Carter. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Richardson, Clinton) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Clinton A. Richardson. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 6/29/2022) (chmb) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-12924710) filed by Stephanie Carter (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) COGS)Attorney Clinton Andreus Richardson added to party Stephanie Carter(pty:pla) (Richardson, Clinton) (Main Document 5 replaced/flattened PDF on 6/29/2022) (ygl). (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to All Defendants. Sent on 6/23/2022. (Herbert, Kyle) Modified text on 7/1/2022 (ygl). (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Facebook Holdings LLC, Facebook Operations LLC, Facebook Payments Inc, Facebook Technologies LLC, Instagram LLC, Meta Platforms Inc, Siculus Inc. (sxf) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sxf) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Facebook Holdings, LLC, Facebook Operations, LLC, Facebook Payments, Inc., Facebook Technologies, LLC, Instagram, LLC, Meta Platforms, Inc., Siculus, Inc. filed by Stephanie Carter, Stephanie ANF F.M. Carter. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-12907881) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Herbert, Kyle) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Siculus, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Meta Platforms, Inc. f/k/a Facebook, Inc. is a litigant