This case was last updated from PACER on 10/17/2020 at 08:05:34 (UTC).

Carstarphen v. Saul

Case Summary

On 10/14/2020 Carstarphen filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Terry F. Moorer and Katherine P. Nelson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00506

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terry F. Moorer

Referral Judge

Katherine P. Nelson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Barbara Carstarphen

Defendant

Andrew M. Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William T. Coplin, Jr.

P. O. Box 987

Demopolis, AL 36732

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER entered; Answer due within 90 days after service; Plaintiff's Brief due 30 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 10/16/20. (skb) (copy to US Atty w/summons on 10/7/20) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

4 #1

Certified Mail Receipts

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul (SSA, US Atty, US Atty Gen). (skb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/16/2020: #1 Certified Mail Receipts) (skb). (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER GRANTING Plf's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as set out. The Clerk is DIRECTED to serve Dft as set out. The Clerk is also DIRECTED to designate this case as a Southern Division case & update the docket sheet as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 10/16/2020. (tot) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

*Restricted*

1 #2

*Restricted*

1 #1

*Restricted*

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul ( IFP.), filed by Barbara Carstarphen. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 1/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Coplin, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/15/2020: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (skb). (Entered: 10/14/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER entered; Answer due within 90 days after service; Plaintiff's Brief due 30 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 10/16/20. (skb) (copy to US Atty w/summons on 10/7/20) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul (SSA, US Atty, US Atty Gen). (skb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/16/2020: #1 Certified Mail Receipts) (skb). (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER GRANTING Plf's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as set out. The Clerk is DIRECTED to serve Dft as set out. The Clerk is also DIRECTED to designate this case as a Southern Division case & update the docket sheet as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 10/16/2020. (tot) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (skb) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Barbara Carstarphen. (Coplin, William) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul ( IFP.), filed by Barbara Carstarphen. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 1/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Coplin, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/15/2020: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (skb). (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less