Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 01/20/2021 at 02:57:14 (UTC).

Carroll v. C R Bard Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 03/30/2020 Carroll filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against C R Bard Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jane M. Virden and Michael P. Mills. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00099

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jane M. Virden

Presiding Judge

Michael P. Mills

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Teresa Carroll

Defendants

C R Bard Incorporated

Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David W Bauman

Attorney at Dalimonte Rueb Stoller LLP

85 Devonshire St., Ste. 1000

Boston, MA 02109

David W. Bauman

Attorney at Dalimonte Rueb Stoller LLP

85 Devonshire St., Ste. 1000

Boston, MA 02109

David Shelton

Attorney at DAVID SHELTON, ATTORNEY

P.O. Box 2541

Oxford, MS 38655

Defendant Attorneys

Richard B. North, Jr.

Attorney at NELSON MULLINS RILEY & SCARBOROUGH, LLP

201 17Th Street Nw, Suite 1700

Atlanta, GA 30363

J. Carter Thompson, Jr.

Attorney at BAKER, DONELSON, BEARMAN & CALDWELL - Jackson

One Eastover Center, 100 Vision Dr., Ste. 400, Post Office Box 14167

Jackson, MS 39236-4167

Elizabeth Ross Hadley

Attorney at GREENBERG TRAURIG

300 West 6Th Street, Suite 2050

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

#39

(#39) ORDER granting #37 Motion to Stay. Upon the expiration of 120 days hereafter, the stay of this case will liftautomatically. In the event that the parties are not able to finalize the settlement within 120 days,the parties must notify the court within three (3) business days thereafter requesting a conferenceto discuss the status of this matter and to revisit any scheduling concerns, as needed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 11/17/20. (bfg)

#35

(#35) ORDER Governing Pretrial Conference and Preparation of Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 9/17/2020. (irw)

#37

(#37) Joint MOTION to Stay DISCOVERY AND ALL PRETRIAL DEADLINES by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Hadley, Elizabeth)

#32

(#32) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/30/2023 at 10:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Discovery due by 11/1/2021. Plaintiffs' Designation of Experts due by 7/2/2021; rebuttal if proper 8/16//2021. Defendants' Designation of Experts 8/2/2021; rebuttal if proper 8/30/2021. Motions due by 1/14/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 9/16/2020. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A) (irw)

#29

No Description Available

#28

No Description Available

#26

No Description Available

#24

No Description Available

#23

No Description Available

#21

No Description Available

20 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#16

No Description Available

14 #1

Supplement Certificate of Consent

9 #7

Master and Short-Form Pleadings

#6

(#6) SECOND AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/20/20. [Amending to Remove Case: Lisa Riley v. C. R. Bard, Inc., 2:18-cv-00896-NV from page 25 of Schedule B] (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/30/2020.] (Entered: 03/23/2020)

#5

(#5) AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/6/20. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/30/2020.] (Entered: 03/19/2020)

#4

(#4) SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. (Third) See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/20. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/30/2020.] (Entered: 03/12/2020)

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) ORDER granting #37 Motion to Stay. Upon the expiration of 120 days hereafter, the stay of this case will liftautomatically. In the event that the parties are not able to finalize the settlement within 120 days,the parties must notify the court within three (3) business days thereafter requesting a conferenceto discuss the status of this matter and to revisit any scheduling concerns, as needed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 11/17/20. (bfg)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #37 Joint MOTION to Stay DISCOVERY AND ALL PRETRIAL DEADLINES filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Hadley, Elizabeth)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Joint MOTION to Stay DISCOVERY AND ALL PRETRIAL DEADLINES by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Hadley, Elizabeth)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #36 Notice of Settlement; L.U.Civ.R. 7(b) states that an application for relief or other action by the court must be presented by a motion and separate memorandum brief. Attorney to file Motion to Stay as a separate docket entry. (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) NOTICE of Settlement and Joint Motion to Stay Case by Elizabeth Ross Hadley on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Hadley, Elizabeth)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ORDER Governing Pretrial Conference and Preparation of Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 9/17/2020. (irw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) NOTICE of Conference: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/30/2023 at 10:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Jointly proposed Pretrial Order due no later than seven (7) days prior to the conference. (irw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 5/1/2023 09:40 AM in Oxford Courtroom 3 East before District Judge Michael P. Mills. (est 20 days) (spw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/30/2023 at 10:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Discovery due by 11/1/2021. Plaintiffs' Designation of Experts due by 7/2/2021; rebuttal if proper 8/16//2021. Defendants' Designation of Experts 8/2/2021; rebuttal if proper 8/30/2021. Motions due by 1/14/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 9/16/2020. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A) (irw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: Case Management Conference held on 9/9/2020. (irw)

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE of Failure by Counsel to be Admitted to Practice Re: David W Bauman (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:17-cv-03026. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketRemark - Case transferred to the Northern District of Mississippi via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/30/2020.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SECOND AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/20/20. [Amending to Remove Case: Lisa Riley v. C. R. Bard, Inc., 2:18-cv-00896-NV from page 25 of Schedule B] (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/30/2020.] (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/6/20. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/30/2020.] (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. (Third) See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/20. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/30/2020.] (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Teresa Carroll. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/30/2020.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • Docket(#2) This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-17-03026-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/30/2020.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14620171 filed by Teresa Carroll. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/30/2020.]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where C.R. Bard, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elizabeth Ross Hadley

Latest cases represented by Lawyer J. Carter Thompson, Jr.