This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/03/2020 at 07:57:22 (UTC).

Carroll et al v. Schlumberger Tech. Corp.

Case Summary

On 03/04/2020 Carroll filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Schlumberger Tech Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Scott T. Varholak and Philip A. Brimmer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00619

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Scott T. Varholak

Presiding Judge

Philip A. Brimmer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Anthony Hamrick

Babatunde Elebe

Tegrity Carroll

Defendant

Schlumberger Tech. Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Andrew Josephson

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap LLP

11 Greenway Plaza, Suite 3050

Houston, TX 77046

William R. Liles

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap LLP

11 Greenway Plaza, Suite 3050

Houston, TX 77046

Andrew W. Dunlap

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap LLP

11 Greenway Plaza, Suite 3050

Houston, TX 77046

Defendant Attorneys

Robert Peter Lombardi

Attorney at Kullman Firm-New Orleans

1100 Poydras Street, Energy Centre, Suite 1600

New Orleans, LA 70163-1600

Bryan Edward Bowdler

Attorney at Kullman Firm-New Orleans

1100 Poydras Street, Energy Centre, Suite 1600

New Orleans, LA 70163-1600

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Tegrity Carroll, Babatunde Elebe, Anthony Hamrick. (Liles, William) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

#13

(#13) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-619-PAB (angar, ) Modified on 4/27/2020 to edit text. (sphil, ). (Entered: 04/23/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Bryan Edward Bowdler on behalf of Schlumberger Tech. Corp.Attorney Bryan Edward Bowdler added to party Schlumberger Tech. Corp.(pty:dft) (Bowdler, Bryan) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

#10

(#10) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Schlumberger Tech. Corp. All parties do not consent.. (Lombardi, Robert) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

#9

(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Schlumberger Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent Schlumberger Limited for Schlumberger Tech. Corp.. (Lombardi, Robert) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Robert Peter Lombardi added to party Schlumberger Tech. Corp.(pty:dft) by Schlumberger Tech. Corp..(Lombardi, Robert) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tegrity Carroll, Anthony Hamrick, Babatunde Elebe. Schlumberger Tech. Corp. served on 3/6/2020, answer due 3/27/2020. (Liles, William) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by William R. Liles on behalf of Tegrity Carroll, Babatunde Elebe, Anthony HamrickAttorney William R. Liles added to party Tegrity Carroll(pty:pla), Attorney William R. Liles added to party Babatunde Elebe(pty:pla), Attorney William R. Liles added to party Anthony Hamrick(pty:pla) (Liles, William) (Entered: 03/08/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew W. Dunlap on behalf of Tegrity Carroll, Babatunde Elebe, Anthony HamrickAttorney Andrew W. Dunlap added to party Tegrity Carroll(pty:pla), Attorney Andrew W. Dunlap added to party Babatunde Elebe(pty:pla), Attorney Andrew W. Dunlap added to party Anthony Hamrick(pty:pla) (Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 03/08/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 5/5/2020 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 4/21/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 4/28/2020, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 3/5/2020. (jgonz, ) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

3 #1

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

#3

(#3) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rsams, ) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Schlumberger Tech. Corp. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7187036)Attorney Michael Andrew Josephson added to party Tegrity Carroll(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Andrew Josephson added to party Babatunde Elebe(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Andrew Josephson added to party Anthony Hamrick(pty:pla), filed by Tegrity Carroll, Anthony Hamrick, Babatunde Elebe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Tegrity Carroll, Babatunde Elebe, Anthony Hamrick. (Liles, William) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • Docket(#15) MINUTE ORDER The Scheduling Conference set for 5/5/2020 11:00 AM is VACATED and RESET as a Telephonic Scheduling Conference on 5/6/2020 09:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. The parties shall participate in the Scheduling Conference by calling 888.808.6929 at the scheduled time and utilizing access code: 2805116#. The Court notes that the parties may hear the conclusion of a prior hearing at the time they call in, and are instructed to simply wait until their case is called. The Court thanks the parties in advance for their patience and flexibility as the Court implements this new technology. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 4/27/2020. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, ) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • Docket(#14) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/23/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-619-PAB (angar, ) Modified on 4/27/2020 to edit text. (sphil, ). (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #10 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-00619-LTB. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, ) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Bryan Edward Bowdler on behalf of Schlumberger Tech. Corp.Attorney Bryan Edward Bowdler added to party Schlumberger Tech. Corp.(pty:dft) (Bowdler, Bryan) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Schlumberger Tech. Corp. All parties do not consent.. (Lombardi, Robert) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Schlumberger Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent Schlumberger Limited for Schlumberger Tech. Corp.. (Lombardi, Robert) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Robert Peter Lombardi added to party Schlumberger Tech. Corp.(pty:dft) by Schlumberger Tech. Corp..(Lombardi, Robert) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tegrity Carroll, Anthony Hamrick, Babatunde Elebe. Schlumberger Tech. Corp. served on 3/6/2020, answer due 3/27/2020. (Liles, William) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by William R. Liles on behalf of Tegrity Carroll, Babatunde Elebe, Anthony HamrickAttorney William R. Liles added to party Tegrity Carroll(pty:pla), Attorney William R. Liles added to party Babatunde Elebe(pty:pla), Attorney William R. Liles added to party Anthony Hamrick(pty:pla) (Liles, William) (Entered: 03/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew W. Dunlap on behalf of Tegrity Carroll, Babatunde Elebe, Anthony HamrickAttorney Andrew W. Dunlap added to party Tegrity Carroll(pty:pla), Attorney Andrew W. Dunlap added to party Babatunde Elebe(pty:pla), Attorney Andrew W. Dunlap added to party Anthony Hamrick(pty:pla) (Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 03/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 5/5/2020 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 4/21/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 4/28/2020, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 3/5/2020. (jgonz, ) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rsams, ) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (rsams, ) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Schlumberger Tech. Corp. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7187036)Attorney Michael Andrew Josephson added to party Tegrity Carroll(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Andrew Josephson added to party Babatunde Elebe(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Andrew Josephson added to party Anthony Hamrick(pty:pla), filed by Tegrity Carroll, Anthony Hamrick, Babatunde Elebe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Schlumberger Technology Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bryan E. Bowdler