This case was last updated from PACER on 10/21/2019 at 07:11:58 (UTC).

Carroll et al v. Quest Diagnostics, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 a Property - Personal Property Fraud case was filed by Carroll against Quest Diagnostics, Inc in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-17038

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Michael A. Hammer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GABRIEL MOLINA

JOHN CARROLL

Defendants

AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY

Optum360

UNITED HEALTH GROUP

QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INC

Optum Inc.

In Re

AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC., CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION

 

Court Documents

#4

***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Leigh Smith to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; party names listed in the 'as to' docket entry and on the summons PDF must exactly match the way they appear in the caption on the pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

#6

(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to American Medical Collection Agency. (dnh) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/31/2019) (cf) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

#9

(#9) CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of New Jersey. (Signed by MDL Panel on 8/16/2019) (sjo) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#5

***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Leigh Smith to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; party names listed in the 'as to' docket entry and on the summons PDF must exactly match the way they appear in the caption on the pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

#11

(#11) Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (gh, ) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#10

(#10) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-07100. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to American Medical Collection Agency, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by John Carroll, Gabriel Molina. (Smith, Leigh) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

#2

***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Leigh Smith to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint, #2 Complaint . The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Plaintiff radio button was selected; the docket entry must reflect all of the defendants the complaint is being filed against. Multiple parties may be selected by holding the 'Ctrl' button. All of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; Add party 'Quest Companies' to the docket. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (dnh) Modified on 7/31/2019 (dnh). (Entered: 07/31/2019)

#8

(#8) INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 10/2/2019 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 15D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Analisa Torres. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/31/2019) (cf) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

10 #1

*Restricted*

#1

***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Leigh Smith to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint, #2 Complaint . The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Plaintiff radio button was selected; the docket entry must reflect all of the defendants the complaint is being filed against. Multiple parties may be selected by holding the 'Ctrl' button. All of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; Add party 'Quest Companies' to the docket. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (dnh) Modified on 7/31/2019 (dnh). (Entered: 07/31/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2019
  • Member Case Transferred in on 8/22/19 from the Southern District of New York 1:19-cv-07100 for MDL 2904 AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC., CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION (gh, ) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (gh, ) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. (gh, ) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-07100. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of New Jersey. (sjo) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of New Jersey. (Signed by MDL Panel on 8/16/2019) (sjo) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 10/2/2019 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 15D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Analisa Torres. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/31/2019) (cf) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/31/2019) (cf) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Leigh Smith to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; party names listed in the 'as to' docket entry and on the summons PDF must exactly match the way they appear in the caption on the pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to American Medical Collection Agency. (dnh) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • Case Designated ECF. (dnh) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Leigh Smith. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (dnh) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Leigh Smith to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint, #2 Complaint . The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Plaintiff radio button was selected; the docket entry must reflect all of the defendants the complaint is being filed against. Multiple parties may be selected by holding the 'Ctrl' button. All of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; Add party 'Quest Companies' to the docket. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (dnh) Modified on 7/31/2019 (dnh). (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Quest Diagnostics, Inc., Quest Diagnostics, Quest Health, Inc., The Quest Companies, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by John Carroll, Gabriel Molina. (Smith, Leigh) Modified on 7/31/2019 (dnh). (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Optum360 Services, Inc., Optum, Inc., United Health Group, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by John Carroll, Gabriel Molina. (Smith, Leigh) Modified on 7/31/2019 (dnh). (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to American Medical Collection Agency, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by John Carroll, Gabriel Molina. (Smith, Leigh) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against American Medical Collection, Optum, Inc., Optum360 Services, Inc., Quest Diagnostics, Incorporated, United Health Group. Document filed by John Carroll, Gabriel Molina.(Smith, Leigh) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17338315)Document filed by John Carroll, Gabriel Molina.(Smith, Leigh) Modified on 7/31/2019 (dnh). (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.