This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2019 at 11:49:11 (UTC).

Carriveau et al v. Apple Transport, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/27/2019 Carriveau filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Apple Transport, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are S. Thomas Anderson and Jon A. York. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01062

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

S. Thomas Anderson

Referral Judge

Jon A. York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Brian Carriveau

Carol Carriveau

Defendants

Apple Transport, Inc.

Balkaran Singh

Not Classified By Court

Circuit Court Clerk Sarah Bradberry

Huntingdon, TN 38344

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Drew Davis

Attorney at DONATI LAW, PLLC

1545 Union Avenue

Memphis, TN 38104

William B. Ryan

Attorney at DONATI LAW FIRM, LLP

1545 Union Ave.

Memphis, TN 38104

Defendant Attorney

John R. Tarpley

Attorney at LEWIS THOMASON KING KRIEG & WALDROP, PC

424 Church Street, Suite 2500

Nashville, TN 37219

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) JUDGMENT. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 6/5/2019. (mbb) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

#11

(#11) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Apple Transport, Inc., Balkaran Singh. (Tarpley, John) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Balkaran Singh.(Tarpley, John) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Apple Transport, Inc..(Tarpley, John) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

#8

(#8) *PLEASE DISREGARD THIS ENTRY AS IT IS A DUPLICATE OF DE #7 .* ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' #6 MOTION FOR EXTENSION. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 4/8/19. (skc) Modified on 4/8/2019 (cdi). (Entered: 04/08/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' #6 MOTION FOR EXTENSION. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 4/8/19. (mbm) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

6 #1

Exhibit Proposed Order

#6

(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Proposed Order Submitted by Apple Transport, Inc., Balkaran Singh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Tarpley, John) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

#2

(#2) Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (mbm) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Balkaran Singh, Apple Transport, Inc. from Carroll County Circuit Court, case number 19CV4 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3026169), filed by Balkaran Singh, Apple Transport, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Tarpley, John) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) JUDGMENT. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 6/5/2019. (mbb) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Apple Transport, Inc., Balkaran Singh. (Tarpley, John) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Balkaran Singh.(Tarpley, John) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Apple Transport, Inc..(Tarpley, John) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) *PLEASE DISREGARD THIS ENTRY AS IT IS A DUPLICATE OF DE #7 .* ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' #6 MOTION FOR EXTENSION. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 4/8/19. (skc) Modified on 4/8/2019 (cdi). (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' #6 MOTION FOR EXTENSION. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 4/8/19. (mbm) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Proposed Order Submitted by Apple Transport, Inc., Balkaran Singh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Tarpley, John) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • (#5) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (mbm) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • (#4) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (mbm) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • (#3) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (mbm) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (mbm) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Balkaran Singh, Apple Transport, Inc. from Carroll County Circuit Court, case number 19CV4 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3026169), filed by Balkaran Singh, Apple Transport, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Tarpley, John) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.