This case was last updated from PACER on 10/18/2020 at 07:18:34 (UTC).

Carrion v. City Of Chicago et al

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 Carrion filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City Of Chicago. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John F. Kness. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-04869

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John F. Kness

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alexander Carrion

Defendants

City Of Chicago

Unknown Chicago Police Officers

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John K. Kennedy

Attorney at Kennedy Watkins LLC

One North State Street, Suite 1500

Chicago, IL 60602

Defendant Attorneys

Maxwell Evan Lisy

Attorney at City Of Chicago Department Of Law

30 N. Lasalle St., Suite 900

Chicago, IL 60602

Joi Kamper

Attorney at City of Chicago Law Dept

30 N. Lasalle St., Suite 900

Chicago, IL 60602

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City Of Chicago by Joi Kamper (Kamper, Joi) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City Of Chicago by Maxwell Evan Lisy (Lisy, Maxwell) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kennedy, John) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Alexander Carrion; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17344597.(Kennedy, John) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City Of Chicago by Joi Kamper (Kamper, Joi) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City Of Chicago by Maxwell Evan Lisy (Lisy, Maxwell) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John F. Kness. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (gw, ) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kennedy, John) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Alexander Carrion; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17344597.(Kennedy, John) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less