This case was last updated from PACER on 03/15/2019 at 07:30:05 (UTC).

Carrillo v. State of New Mexico ex rel. et al

Case Summary

On 01/14/2019 Carrillo filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against State of New Mexico ex rel. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen B. Molzen and James O. Browning. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00029

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Mexico District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen B. Molzen

Presiding Judge

James O. Browning

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Destinee Jacklyn Carrillo

Albuquerque, NM 87108

Defendants

Children Youth and Families Department

Maria Morales

Mary Darkangeles

Diedre Mallon

Ranea Richards Charney

Cynthia Tessman

Sasha Lynman

Shondrea Perdue

State of New Mexico ex rel.

FNU Casato

Will Parnell

Julie Parra

Ashely Williams

State of New Mexico

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Cynthia Tessman

Attorney at Davis & Pierce, PC

Po Box 6

Albuquerque, NM 87102

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Mail Returned as Undeliverable re 9 Letter. Mail sent to Cynthia Tessman (vv) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

#8

(#8) Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Mail sent to Cynthia Tessman (vv) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Destinee Jacklyn Carrillo. (vv) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

#6

(#6) Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #5 Notice (Other). Mail sent to Cynthia Tessman (vv) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

#5

(#5) Information Sheet for T.R.O. by Destinee Jacklyn Carrillo (jg) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

#3

(#3) CM/ECF Pro Se Notification Form by Destinee Jacklyn Carrillo (jg) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

#2

No Description Available

1 #1

Supplement

#1

No Description Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Mail Returned as Undeliverable re 9 Letter. Mail sent to Cynthia Tessman (vv) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Mail sent to Cynthia Tessman (vv) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Destinee Jacklyn Carrillo. (vv) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #5 Notice (Other). Mail sent to Cynthia Tessman (vv) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Information Sheet for T.R.O. by Destinee Jacklyn Carrillo (jg) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • United States District Judge James O. Browning assigned. (jg) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • (#4) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that United States Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen has been assigned for a 28 U.S.C. 1915 review. (jg)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • United States Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen assigned. (jg) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CM/ECF Pro Se Notification Form by Destinee Jacklyn Carrillo (jg) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.