This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/13/2021 at 11:50:26 (UTC).

Carrasco v. Henkell

Case Summary

On 10/14/2021 Carrasco filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Henkell. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are David Counts and Ronald C. Griffin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:21-CV-00190

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David Counts

Referral Judge

Ronald C. Griffin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Erik Carrasco

Defendant

Terry Henkell

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Scott H. Palmer

Attorney at Scott H. Palmer PC

15455 Dallas Parkway, Ste 540

Addison, TX 75001

James Painter Roberts

Attorney at Scott H. Palmer, PC

15455 Dallas Parkway, Suite 540

Addison, TX 75001

Defendant Attorneys

Thomas Phillip Brandt

Attorney at Fanning Harper Martinson Brandt & Kutchin, P.C.

Two Energy Square, 4849 Greenville Ave.

Dallas, TX 75206

Christopher Thomas Brandt

Attorney at Fanning Harper Martinson Brandt and Kutchin PC

4849 Greenville Avenue, Suite 1300

Dallas, TX 75206

Laura Dahl O'Leary

Attorney at Fannying Harper Martinson Brandt & Kutchin

4849 Greenville Ave., Suite 130

Dallas, TX 75205

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Erik Carrasco. Terry Henkell served on 10/18/2021, answer due 11/8/2021. (Roberts, James) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

#7

(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Terry Henkell. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (Brandt, Thomas) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

7 #1

Proposed Order

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas Phillip Brandt on behalf of Terry Henkell. Attorney Thomas Phillip Brandt added to party Terry Henkell(pty:dft) (Brandt, Thomas) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Laura Dahl O'Leary on behalf of Terry Henkell. Attorney Laura Dahl O'Leary added to party Terry Henkell(pty:dft) (O'Leary, Laura) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Thomas Brandt on behalf of Terry Henkell. Attorney Christopher Thomas Brandt added to party Terry Henkell(pty:dft) (Brandt, Christopher) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#11

(#11) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Terry Henkell.. Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (Brandt, Thomas) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Terry Henkell.. Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (Brandt, Thomas) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #7 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. It is ORDERED the deadline for Defendant to file an Answer or Other Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Original Complaint is extended to November 29, 2021. It is so ORDERED. Entered by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Thomas Brandt on behalf of Terry Henkell. Attorney Christopher Thomas Brandt added to party Terry Henkell(pty:dft) (Brandt, Christopher) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Laura Dahl O'Leary on behalf of Terry Henkell. Attorney Laura Dahl O'Leary added to party Terry Henkell(pty:dft) (O'Leary, Laura) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas Phillip Brandt on behalf of Terry Henkell. Attorney Thomas Phillip Brandt added to party Terry Henkell(pty:dft) (Brandt, Thomas) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Terry Henkell. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (Brandt, Thomas) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Erik Carrasco. Terry Henkell served on 10/18/2021, answer due 11/8/2021. (Roberts, James) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Terry Henkell. (slt) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge David Counts and Judge Ronald C. Griffin. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Ronald C. Griffin pursuant to the Standing Order on Case Management found at #Standing Orders. (slt) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott H. Palmer on behalf of Erik Carrasco. Attorney Scott H. Palmer added to party Erik Carrasco(pty:pla) (Palmer, Scott) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Erik Carrasco. (Roberts, James) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Parties by Erik Carrasco. (Roberts, James) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15334072), filed by Erik Carrasco. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Roberts, James) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laura Dahl O'Leary

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas Phillip Brandt