This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/06/2020 at 08:47:50 (UTC).

Carranza et al v. Reams

Case Summary

On 04/07/2020 Carranza filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Reams. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Philip A. Brimmer and S. Kato Crews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00977

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Philip A. Brimmer

Referral Judge

S. Kato Crews

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Thomas Lewis

Jesus Martinez

Colby Propes

Chad Hunter

Thomas Carranza

Richard Barnum

Michael Ward

Defendant

Steven Reams

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mark Silverstein

Daniel David Williams

Lauren Elizabeth Groth

Rebecca Teitelbaum Wallace

Sara R. Neel

Andrew Joseph McNulty

David George Maxted

David A. Lane

Jamie Hughes Hubbard

Michael Paul Fairhurst

Darold W. Killmer

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew David Ringel

Matthew Joseph Hegarty

John Felix Peters

 

Court Documents

#63

60 #14

Exhibit H-6 -- Spec_Care_Inmates

60 #13

Exhibit H-5 -- Suicide_Prevention_and_Intervention

60 #9

Exhibit H-1 --Inmate_Classification

60 #6

Exhibit F-5 -- Daily Data from 04-30-2020 to 05-17-2020

60 #5

Exhibit F-4 -- List of ''Medically Vulnerable'' Inmates As D

60 #2

Exhibit F-1 -- April 28 2020 COVID-19 SCREENING FORM

60 #1

Exhibit F -- Second Suppl Decl of Capt Matthew Turner for Def Resp to ECF 55

#60

#4

#3

#2

1 #5

Proposed Order (PDF Only)

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - Ward Declaration

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Carranza Declaration

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Franco-Paredes Report

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Meyer Declaration

#1

146 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) NOTICE re #62 MOTION for Hearing/Conference re #60 Notice (Other),,,, Plaintiffs' Motion for Forthwith Hearing Regarding Defendant's Non-Compliance with the Court's Preliminary Injunction SUBMISSION OF SUPPLEMENTAL SUPPORT by Plaintiffs Richard Barnum, Thomas Carranza, Chad Hunter, Thomas Lewis, Jesus Martinez, Colby Propes, Michael Ward (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 First Supplemental Declaration)(Killmer, Darold) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) MOTION for Hearing/Conference re #60 Notice (Other),,,, Plaintiffs' Motion for Forthwith Hearing Regarding Defendant's Non-Compliance with the Court's Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Richard Barnum, Thomas Carranza, Chad Hunter, Thomas Lewis, Jesus Martinez, Colby Propes, Michael Ward. (Hubbard, Jamie) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) TRANSCRIPT of Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction held on April 30, 2020 before Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer. Pages: 1-261.
    < NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov.

    < Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (jcopp, ) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) Defendant's NOTICE of Complete Compliance re #55 Order on Motion for TRO, by Defendant Steven Reams (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F -- Second Suppl Decl of Capt Matthew Turner for Def Resp to ECF 55, #2 Exhibit F-1 -- April 28 2020 COVID-19 SCREENING FORM, #3 Exhibit F-2 -- 05-13-2020 ''Medically Vulnerable'' Screening Tool, #4 Exhibit F-3 -- ''Medically Vulnerable'' Interview Screening Tool, #5 Exhibit F-4 -- List of ''Medically Vulnerable'' Inmates As Defined By the Court, #6 Exhibit F-5 -- Daily Data from 04-30-2020 to 05-17-2020, #7 Exhibit G -- Decl of Undersheriff Donnie Patch for Def Resp to ECF 55, #8 Exhibit H -- Suppl Decl of Sheriff Reams for Def Resp to ECF 55, #9 Exhibit H-1 --Inmate_Classification, #10 Exhibit H-2 -- Inmate_Reception, #11 Exhibit H-3 -- Inmate_Screening_and_Evaluations, #12 Exhibit H-4 -- Special_Management_Inmates, #13 Exhibit H-5 -- Suicide_Prevention_and_Intervention, #14 Exhibit H-6 -- Spec_Care_Inmates)(Hegarty, Matthew) Modified on 5/19/2020 to edit text. (sphil, ). (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference is set for 7/9/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 7/2/2020. The Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF. #14 ) is due 7/2/2020. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 5/12/2020. Text Only Entry (skclc2) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) CASE REASSIGNED pursuant #57 Order of Recusal. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-00977-PAB-SKC. (Text Only Entry) (tsher, ) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) ORDER OF RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/12/2020. The Clerk of the Court to cause this matter to be reassigned by random draw to another Magistrate Judge. (tsher, ) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • Docket(#56) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/12/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/11/2020, re: #1 portion of plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Expedited Hearing seeking a preliminary injunction is GRANTED IN PART. ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction is otherwise is DENIED. ORDERED that, on or before May 18, 2020, at 5:00 p.m., defendant shall certify to the Court that he has compiled a list of those persons ("medically vulnerable inmates") currently held at the Weld County Jail who have one or more of the following conditions: are 65 years and older, have chronic lung disease or moderate to severeasthma, have serious heart conditions, are immunocompromised, have severe obesity, have diabetes, have chronic kidney disease and undergoing dialysis, or have liver disease. ORDERED that, on or before May 21, 2020, at 5:00 p.m., defendant is ordered to file a report with the Court, identifying what new policies have been instituted in accordance with this order. Defendant shall explain in such report what steps the Jail has taken to acquire an adequate mask supply for inmates housed in the Jail.(sphil, ) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) NOTICE of Supplemental Authorities in Support of Supplemental Response re: #41 Response to Motion,,,,,,,, by Defendant Steven Reams (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit A-3)(Peters, John) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2020
  • Docket(#10) Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 1082-7241801. (alave, ) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lauren Elizabeth Groth on behalf of Richard Barnum, Thomas LewisAttorney Lauren Elizabeth Groth added to party Richard Barnum(pty:pla), Attorney Lauren Elizabeth Groth added to party Thomas Lewis(pty:pla) (Groth, Lauren) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Daniel David Williams on behalf of Richard Barnum, Thomas LewisAttorney Daniel David Williams added to party Richard Barnum(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel David Williams added to party Thomas Lewis(pty:pla) (Williams, Daniel) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief against Steven Reams, filed by Colby Propes, Richard Barnum, Chad Hunter, Jesus Martinez, Thomas Carranza, Thomas Lewis, Michael Ward. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McNulty, Andrew) Modified on 4/8/2020 to correct docket. (alave, ). (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • Docket(#6) Administrative Notice: No initiating document. Attorney contacted with instructions to file the initiating document within 24 hours. (Text Only Entry) (trvo, ) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Rebecca Teitelbaum Wallace on behalf of Richard Barnum, Thomas LewisAttorney Rebecca Teitelbaum Wallace added to party Richard Barnum(pty:pla), Attorney Rebecca Teitelbaum Wallace added to party Thomas Lewis(pty:pla) (Wallace, Rebecca) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Mark Silverstein on behalf of Richard Barnum, Thomas LewisAttorney Mark Silverstein added to party Richard Barnum(pty:pla), Attorney Mark Silverstein added to party Thomas Lewis(pty:pla) (Silverstein, Mark) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sara R. Neel on behalf of Richard Barnum, Thomas LewisAttorney Sara R. Neel added to party Richard Barnum(pty:pla), Attorney Sara R. Neel added to party Thomas Lewis(pty:pla) (Neel, Sara) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Certify Class by Plaintiffs Richard Barnum, Thomas Carranza, Chad Hunter, Thomas Lewis, Jesus Martinez, Colby Propes, Michael Ward. (McNulty, Andrew) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Hearing by Plaintiffs Thomas Carranza, Chad Hunter, Jesus Martinez, Colby Propes, Michael Ward. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Meyer Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Franco-Paredes Report, #3 Exhibit 3 - Carranza Declaration, #4 Exhibit 4 - Ward Declaration, #5 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(McNulty, Andrew) (sphil, ). Modified on 4/22/2020 to edit text. (sphil, ). (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less