This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/29/2019 at 09:32:21 (UTC).

Carr v. Warren et al

Case Summary

On 09/30/2019 Carr filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Warren. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are EBC and John E. Jones, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01698

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

EBC

Presiding Judge

John E. Jones, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Donald Carr

Marienville, PA 16239

Defendants

C.O. McCoy

C.O. Brennon

John Doe (1)

C.O. Kodack

C.O. Evans

David Warren

C.O. Chowares

C.O. Randall

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Anthony R. Bowers

Attorney at PA Office of Attorney General

Strawberry Square, 15Th Floor

Harrisburg, PA 17120

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by C.O. Kodack, C.O. Randall, C.O. Evans, David Warren, C.O. Brennon, C.O. Chowares, C.O. McCoy. C.O. Kodack waiver sent on 10/28/2019, answer due 12/27/2019; C.O. Randall waiver sent on 10/28/2019, answer due 12/27/2019; C.O. Evans waiver sent on 10/28/2019, answer due 12/27/2019; David Warren waiver sent on 10/28/2019, answer due 12/27/2019; C.O. Brennon waiver sent on 10/28/2019, answer due 12/27/2019; C.O. Chowares waiver sent on 10/28/2019, answer due 12/27/2019; C.O. McCoy waiver sent on 10/28/2019, answer due 12/27/2019. (Bowers, Anthony) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony R. Bowers on behalf of C.O. Brennon, C.O. Chowares, C.O. Evans, C.O. Kodack, C.O. McCoy, C.O. Randall, David Warren (Bowers, Anthony) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

#10

(#10) MOTION for Discovery filed by Donald Carr.(mfa) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

9 #1

Mailing Labels

#9

(#9) Waiver of Service forms (AO 398 and 399) Mailed to C.O. Brennon, C.O. Chowares, C.O. Evans, C.O. Kodack, C.O. McCoy, C.O. Randall, David Warren Waiver of Service due by 11/27/2019. WAIVERS NOT SENT TO JOHN DOE(1) DUE TO NO NAME. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Labels)(mfa) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK'S OFFICE TO SEND AO 398 AND 399 WAIVERS FORMS to defendants. ; granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperisSigned by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 10/28/19. (mfa) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

#7

(#7) MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Donald Carr re #1 Complaint (Lodged with Motion for IFP). (kpf) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

6 #1

Notice of Consent

#6

(#6) PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (lp) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

#5

(#5) STANDING PRACTICE ORDER Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 02/08/2011. (lp) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

#4

(#4) U.S. MARSHAL - 285, AO 398 and AO 399 Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff. (lp) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis including certification by Donald Carr.(lp) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants lodged pending the disposition of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Donald Carr.(lp) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by C.O. Kodack, C.O. Randall, C.O. Evans, David Warren, C.O. Brennon, C.O. Chowares, C.O. McCoy. C.O. Kodack waiver sent on 10/28/2019, answer due 12/27/2019; C.O. Randall waiver sent on 10/28/2019, answer due 12/27/2019; C.O. Evans waiver sent on 10/28/2019, answer due 12/27/2019; David Warren waiver sent on 10/28/2019, answer due 12/27/2019; C.O. Brennon waiver sent on 10/28/2019, answer due 12/27/2019; C.O. Chowares waiver sent on 10/28/2019, answer due 12/27/2019; C.O. McCoy waiver sent on 10/28/2019, answer due 12/27/2019. (Bowers, Anthony) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony R. Bowers on behalf of C.O. Brennon, C.O. Chowares, C.O. Evans, C.O. Kodack, C.O. McCoy, C.O. Randall, David Warren (Bowers, Anthony) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Discovery filed by Donald Carr.(mfa) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Waiver of Service forms (AO 398 and 399) Mailed to C.O. Brennon, C.O. Chowares, C.O. Evans, C.O. Kodack, C.O. McCoy, C.O. Randall, David Warren Waiver of Service due by 11/27/2019. WAIVERS NOT SENT TO JOHN DOE(1) DUE TO NO NAME. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Labels)(mfa) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK'S OFFICE TO SEND AO 398 AND 399 WAIVERS FORMS to defendants. ; granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperisSigned by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 10/28/19. (mfa) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Donald Carr re #1 Complaint (Lodged with Motion for IFP). (kpf) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (lp) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STANDING PRACTICE ORDER Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 02/08/2011. (lp) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) U.S. MARSHAL - 285, AO 398 and AO 399 Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff. (lp) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Donald Carr. (lp) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis including certification by Donald Carr.(lp) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants lodged pending the disposition of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Donald Carr.(lp) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where C.O. Evans is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anthony R. Bowers