This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/20/2022 at 07:16:00 (UTC).

Carpenter v. Stephens et al

Case Summary

On 12/22/2021 Carpenter filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Stephens. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Marcia A. Crone and Zack Hawthorn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00612

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marcia A. Crone

Referral Judge

Zack Hawthorn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Travis Carpenter

236617, Jefferson County Correctional Facility

Beaumont, TX 77705

Defendants

Zena Stephens

FNU Minter

FNU Morris

FNU Harrington

FNU Lewis

FNU Harrell

All Ranking Officers

FNU Guillory

Keefe Group

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) ORDER. It is ordered that the claims of each Plaintiff shall proceed as separate actions. John Mark Whatley will remain the Plaintiff in this civil action number. The Clerk of Court is directed to SEVER the claims of Plaintiffs Carpenter and Holloway into separate actions and assign each lawsuit a separate civil action number. (Originally filed in case no. 1:21cv549) Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine L. Stetson on 12/22/21. (kcv, ) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

#2

(#2) 42:1983 COMPLAINT against All Ranking Officers, FNU Guillory, FNU Harrell, FNU Harrington, Keefe Group, FNU Lewis, FNU Minter, FNU Morris, Zena Stephens, filed by Travis Carpenter.(kcv, ) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

#3

(#3) Letter from Travis James Carpenter requesting status. (mailed docket sheet 12/29/21) (kcv, ) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

#4

(#4) PRELIMINARY FILING FEE ORDER that plaintiff shall, within twenty days from the date set forth below, pay the $402.00 filing fee or submit a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis including a statement certified by an authorized prison official showing the average balance in and deposits into plaintiff's inmate trust account for the preceding six months. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 12/29/2021. (bjc, ) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

#5

(#5) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Travis Carpenter. (tkd, ) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#6

(#6) EVIDENCE against Keefe Commissary Group LLC by Travis Carpenter (tkd, ) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#7

(#7) LETTER from Travis Carpenter regarding evidence and documentation from original case 1:21cv549 which is not in this severed action. (tkd, ) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#8

(#8) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Travis Carpenter on 1/12/22 as to #4 Preliminary Filing Fee Order. (ljw, ) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

#9

(#9) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending this case should be dismissed without prejudice for want of prosecution pursuant to FRCP 41(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 2/7/2022. (bjc, ) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

#10

(#10) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Travis Carpenter on 2/11/22 as to #9 Report and Recommendations. (ljw, ) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE to the court regarding filing fee by Travis Carpenter (bjc, ) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE to the court regarding filing fee by Travis Carpenter (bjc, ) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Travis Carpenter on 2/11/22 as to #9 Report and Recommendations. (ljw, ) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending this case should be dismissed without prejudice for want of prosecution pursuant to FRCP 41(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 2/7/2022. (bjc, ) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Travis Carpenter on 1/12/22 as to #4 Preliminary Filing Fee Order. (ljw, ) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketFiling fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 1-21301 (mac, ) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) LETTER from Travis Carpenter regarding evidence and documentation from original case 1:21cv549 which is not in this severed action. (tkd, ) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) EVIDENCE against Keefe Commissary Group LLC by Travis Carpenter (tkd, ) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Travis Carpenter. (tkd, ) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PRELIMINARY FILING FEE ORDER that plaintiff shall, within twenty days from the date set forth below, pay the $402.00 filing fee or submit a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis including a statement certified by an authorized prison official showing the average balance in and deposits into plaintiff's inmate trust account for the preceding six months. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 12/29/2021. (bjc, ) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Letter from Travis James Carpenter requesting status. (mailed docket sheet 12/29/21) (kcv, ) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. (kcv, ) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) 42:1983 COMPLAINT against All Ranking Officers, FNU Guillory, FNU Harrell, FNU Harrington, Keefe Group, FNU Lewis, FNU Minter, FNU Morris, Zena Stephens, filed by Travis Carpenter.(kcv, ) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ORDER. It is ordered that the claims of each Plaintiff shall proceed as separate actions. John Mark Whatley will remain the Plaintiff in this civil action number. The Clerk of Court is directed to SEVER the claims of Plaintiffs Carpenter and Holloway into separate actions and assign each lawsuit a separate civil action number. (Originally filed in case no. 1:21cv549) Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine L. Stetson on 12/22/21. (kcv, ) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Keefe Group, LLC is a litigant