This case was last updated from PACER on 12/05/2019 at 05:37:03 (UTC).

Carpenter v. First Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 a Labor - Employee Benefit case was filed by Carpenter against First Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-03382

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy M Cain

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Susan Carpenter

Defendant

First Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Melissa Leila Louzri

Attorney at Foster Law Firm

Po Box 2123

Greenville, SC 29602

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Amended Complaint by Susan Carpenter. Response to Motion due by 1/21/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Louzri, Melissa) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

9 #1

Green card and DOI Letter

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susan Carpenter. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company served on 12/13/2019, answer due 1/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Green card and DOI Letter)(Louzri, Melissa) (Main Document 9 replaced on 12/19/2019: to replace with corrected document (case number) as provided by filing user) (kmca). (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. (kmca) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#6

(#6) Amended Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Susan Carpenter.(Louzri, Melissa) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#5

(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company, filed by Susan Carpenter. Service due by 3/9/2020 (Louzri, Melissa) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to First Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. (kmca) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#3

(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Susan Carpenter.(kmca) Modified on 12/10/2019: see #6 Amended LR 26.01s (kmca). (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against First Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8807091), filed by Susan Carpenter. Service due by 3/3/2020.(kmca) Modified on 12/10/2019: see #5 Amended Complaint (kmca). (Entered: 12/04/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company answer due 2/2/2020. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Timothy M Cain on 1/6/20.(kmca) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Amended Complaint by Susan Carpenter. Response to Motion due by 1/21/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Louzri, Melissa) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susan Carpenter. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company served on 12/13/2019, answer due 1/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Green card and DOI Letter)(Louzri, Melissa) (Main Document 9 replaced on 12/19/2019: to replace with corrected document (case number) as provided by filing user) (kmca). (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. (kmca) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Amended Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Susan Carpenter.(Louzri, Melissa) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company, filed by Susan Carpenter. Service due by 3/9/2020 (Louzri, Melissa) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to First Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. (kmca) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Susan Carpenter.(kmca) Modified on 12/10/2019: see #6 Amended LR 26.01s (kmca). (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against First Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8807091), filed by Susan Carpenter. Service due by 3/3/2020.(kmca) Modified on 12/10/2019: see #5 Amended Complaint (kmca). (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.