This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/19/2020 at 09:13:55 (UTC).

CARPENTER v. CITY OF PHILADELPHIA et al

Case Summary

On 02/19/2020 CARPENTER filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against CITY OF PHILADELPHIA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is GENE E.K. PRATTER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00916

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GENE E.K. PRATTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAMES CARPENTER

Defendants

CITY OF PHILADELPHIA

LAWRENCE S. KRASNER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SIDNEY L. GOLD

Attorney at SIDNEY L. GOLD & ASSOCIATES, PC

Eleven Penn Ctr Suite 515, 1835 Market St

Philadelphia, PA 19103

TRACI M. GREENBERG

Attorney at SIDNEY L. GOLD & ASSOCIATES, PC

1835 Market St., Suite 515

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant Attorney

BENJAMIN RICHARD PATCHEN

Attorney at CITY OF PHILADELPHIA LAW DEPARTMENT

1515 Arch Street, 16Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19102-1595

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE AN ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT BY NO LATER THAN JUNE 12, 2020. SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 4/9/2020. 4/13/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, ) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JAMES CARPENTER. CITY OF PHILADELPHIA waiver sent on 3/11/2020, answer due 5/11/2020. (GOLD, SIDNEY) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JAMES CARPENTER. LAWRENCE S. KRASNER waiver sent on 3/11/2020, answer due 5/11/2020. (GOLD, SIDNEY) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by BENJAMIN RICHARD PATCHEN on behalf of CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, LAWRENCE S. KRASNER with certificate of service(PATCHEN, BENJAMIN) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by TRACI M. GREENBERG on behalf of JAMES CARPENTER (GREENBERG, TRACI) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, LAWRENCE S. KRASNER ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE211648.), filed by JAMES CARPENTER.(dmc, ) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE AN ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT BY NO LATER THAN JUNE 12, 2020. SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 4/9/2020. 4/13/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, ) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JAMES CARPENTER. CITY OF PHILADELPHIA waiver sent on 3/11/2020, answer due 5/11/2020. (GOLD, SIDNEY) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JAMES CARPENTER. LAWRENCE S. KRASNER waiver sent on 3/11/2020, answer due 5/11/2020. (GOLD, SIDNEY) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by BENJAMIN RICHARD PATCHEN on behalf of CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, LAWRENCE S. KRASNER with certificate of service(PATCHEN, BENJAMIN) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by TRACI M. GREENBERG on behalf of JAMES CARPENTER (GREENBERG, TRACI) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketTwo Summonses Issued as to CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, LAWRENCE S. KRASNER. Forwarded To: SIDNEY L. GOLD, ESQ. on 2/20/2020 (dmc, ) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by JAMES CARPENTER. (dmc, ) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, LAWRENCE S. KRASNER ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE211648.), filed by JAMES CARPENTER.(dmc, ) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JAMES CARPENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Traci M. Greenberg Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sidney L. Gold